This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2018 at 05:48:47 (UTC).

Gibbs et al v. Rees et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2018 Gibbs filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Rees. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00714

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Darlene Gibbs

Patrick Inscho

Stephanie Edwards

Lawrence Mwethuku

Lula Williams

Defendants

TC Loan Service, LLC

TC Decision Sciences, LLC

Kenneth Rees

Tail Wind Marketing, LLC

GPL Servicing

Think Finance Inc

Think Finance SPV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at Kelly & Crandall PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Rd, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at Kelly & Crandall PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Rd, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at Kelly & Crandall PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Rd, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Craig Carley Marchiando

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

Elizabeth W. Hanes

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

James Wilson Speer

Attorney at Virginia Proverty Law Center

919 E Main Street, Suite 610

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorneys

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg, 1001 Haxall Point, Po Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23218

Kymberly Kochis

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP (NY)

The Grace Building, 40Th Floor, 1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-7703

Lewis Steven Wiener

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

700 Sixth Street Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20001-3980

Matthew Owen Gatewood

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP (DC)

700 Sixth St Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20001

Timothy James St. George

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg, 1001 Haxall Point, Po Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23218

David Foster Herman

Attorney at Montgomery McCracken Walker Rhoads LLP

123 S Broad St

Philadelphia, PA 19109

Jonathan Peter Boughrum

Attorney at Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads LLP

123 S Broad St

Philadelphia, PA 19109

Richard Lawrence Scheff

Attorney at Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads LLP

123 S Broad St

Philadelphia, PA 19109

Aaron Harvey Marks

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NY-NA)

601 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10022

Daniel Peter Shapiro

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP (IL-NA)

525 W Monroe St, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60661-3693

Dawn Marie Canty

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP (IL-NA)

525 W Monroe St, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60661-3693

Patrick Malley Smith

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP (IL-NA)

525 W Monroe St, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60661-3693

Ross Lee Weiner

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NY-NA)

601 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10022

Ashley Partin Peterson

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP (Richmond)

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#134

(#134) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 03/26/2018)

133 #1

*Restricted*

#133

(#133) Case electronically transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00386. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 03/26/2018)

#132

(#132) ORDER. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court GRANTS Defendant Kenneth Rees's Motion to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1412, (ECF No. 92), and Defendant GPL Servicing's Motion to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1412, (ECF No. 111). he Court DENIES AS MOOT Rees's Motion to Transfer Case Pursuant to the First -to-File Rule. (ECF No. 24.) The Court TRANSFERS this action to the District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 03/23/2018. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

#131

(#131) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 03/23/2018. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

130 #2

Exhibit 2 - Williams Order

#130

(#130) Memorandum in Support re #129 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku, Lula Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Martorello's Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Williams Order)(Kelly, Kristi) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/13/2018)

129 #1

Proposed Order

#129

(#129) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku, Lula Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Kristi) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/13/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenneth Rees. Kenneth Rees waiver sent on 5/31/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 06/09/2017)

#4

Notice of Correction re #4 Summons Returned Executed, Clerk has updated and reset the answer deadlines. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to TC Loan Service, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Removed header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 05/19/2017)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to GPL Servicing, Kenneth Rees, TC Decision Sciences, LLC, Tailwind Marketing, LLC, Think Finance SPV, LLC, Think Finance, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove Header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 05/19/2017)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit Great Plain Loan Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit Plain Green Loan Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit March 11, 2011 Term Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GPL Servicing, Kenneth Rees, TC Decision Sciences, LLC, TC Loan Service, LLC, Tailwind Marketing, LLC, Think Finance SPV, LLC, Think Finance, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5532748.), filed by Lula Williams, Stephanie Edwards, Patrick Inscho, Darlene Gibbs, Lawrence Mwethuku. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit March 11, 2011 Term Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit Plain Green Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit Great Plain Loan Agreement)(tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 05/19/2017)

251 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#134) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 03/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#133) Case electronically transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00386. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 03/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#132) ORDER. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court GRANTS Defendant Kenneth Rees's Motion to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1412, (ECF No. 92), and Defendant GPL Servicing's Motion to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1412, (ECF No. 111). he Court DENIES AS MOOT Rees's Motion to Transfer Case Pursuant to the First -to-File Rule. (ECF No. 24.) The Court TRANSFERS this action to the District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 03/23/2018. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 03/23/2018. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) Memorandum in Support re #129 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku, Lula Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Martorello's Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Williams Order)(Kelly, Kristi) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku, Lula Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Kristi) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on February 28, 2018, before Judge M. Hannah Lauck, Court Reporter Diane Daffron, Telephone number 804 916-2893. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2018.(daffron, diane) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) REPLY to Response to Motion re #111 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1412 filed by GPL Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peterson, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck:Status Conference held on 2/28/2018. regarding status of bankruptcy, TX cases, Florida cases. Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Diane Daffron, OCR.)(khan, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#125) Memorandum in Opposition re #111 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1412 filed by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku, Lula Williams. (Kelly, Kristi) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kenneth Rees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by TC Decision Sciences, LLC, TC Loan Service, LLC, Tail Wind Marketing, LLC, Think Finance SPV, LLC, Think Finance, Inc.. (Anthony, David) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TC Decision Sciences, LLC, TC Loan Service, LLC, Tail Wind Marketing, LLC, Think Finance SPV, LLC, Think Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #4 Summons Returned Executed, Clerk has updated and reset the answer deadlines. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lula Williams, Stephanie Edwards, Patrick Inscho, Darlene Gibbs, Lawrence Mwethuku. GPL Servicing waiver sent on 6/5/2017, answer due 8/4/2017; TC Decision Sciences, LLC waiver sent on 5/31/2017, answer due 7/31/2017; TC Loan Service, LLC waiver sent on 5/31/2017, answer due 7/31/2017; Tail Wind Marketing, LLC waiver sent on 5/31/2017, answer due 7/31/2017; Think Finance SPV, LLC waiver sent on 5/31/2017, answer due 7/31/2017; Think Finance, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 letters)(tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenneth Rees. Kenneth Rees waiver sent on 5/31/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 06/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed SEE: Waivers of Service #6 Executed by GPL Servicing; Kenneth Rees; TC Decision Sciences, LLC; TC Loan Service, LLC; Tail Wind Marketing, LLC; Think Finance SPV, LLC; Think Finance, Inc., (tjoh, ) Modified on 6/20/2017 to correct text. (tjoh, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to TC Loan Service, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Removed header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 05/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to GPL Servicing, Kenneth Rees, TC Decision Sciences, LLC, Tailwind Marketing, LLC, Think Finance SPV, LLC, Think Finance, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove Header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 05/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against GPL Servicing, Kenneth Rees, TC Decision Sciences, LLC, TC Loan Service, LLC, Tailwind Marketing, LLC, Think Finance SPV, LLC, Think Finance, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5532748.), filed by Lula Williams, Stephanie Edwards, Patrick Inscho, Darlene Gibbs, Lawrence Mwethuku. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit March 11, 2011 Term Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit Plain Green Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit Great Plain Loan Agreement)(tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/26/2018.] (Entered: 05/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tail Wind Marketing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TC Decision Sciences LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Think Finance Inc is a litigant