This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:03:13 (UTC).

Gibbs #137358 v. Michigan Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Gibbs 137358 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Michigan Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Ray Kent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00948

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul D. Gibbs #137358

Ionia, MI 48846

Defendants

Adam Yukins

Michigan Department of Corrections

Unknown Sizemore

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Attachment 1-2

#5

(#5) ORDER denying #3 motion to appoint counsel ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Paul D. Gibbs #137358; (clw) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#6

(#6) OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

2 #1

Financial Documents

#7

(#7) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim; the Court discerns no good-faith basis for an appeal ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Paul D. Gibbs #137358; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (clw) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Michigan Department of Corrections, Unknown Sizemore, Adam Yukins filed by Paul D. Gibbs #137358 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-2) (clw) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS REGARDING APPEAL FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial appeal fee; plaintiff remains liable for the entire appeal fee amount ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Opinion (Screening) #6 , Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #5 , Order to Proceed IFP on Appeal - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner #4 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #7 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Paul D. Gibbs #137358 returned to the Court marked Out on Writ; re-mailed 10/2/2018 (clw) Modified text on 10/2/2018 (clw). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Opinion (Screening) #6 , Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #5 , Order to Proceed IFP on Appeal - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner #4 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #7 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Paul D. Gibbs #137358 returned to the Court marked Out on Writ; re-mailed 10/2/2018 (clw) Modified text on 10/2/2018 (clw). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #5 , Order to Proceed IFP on Appeal - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner #4 , Opinion (Screening) #6 , certified copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Paul D. Gibbs #137358 (clw) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim; the Court discerns no good-faith basis for an appeal ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER denying #3 motion to appoint counsel ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS REGARDING APPEAL FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial appeal fee; plaintiff remains liable for the entire appeal fee amount ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Paul D. Gibbs #137358; (clw) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Paul D. Gibbs #137358; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (clw) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Michigan Department of Corrections, Unknown Sizemore, Adam Yukins filed by Paul D. Gibbs #137358 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-2) (clw) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less