This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2019 at 08:04:54 (UTC).

GFM 23, LLC v. IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 GFM 23, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nora Barry Fischer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01525

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nora Barry Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GFM 23, LLC

Defendant

IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William G. McConnell, Jr.

Attorney at McConnell Law Firm, LLC

3547 East State Street, P.O. Box 1777

Hermitage, PA 16148

Defendant Attorney

Mark G. Claypool

Attorney at Knox, McLaughlin, Gornall & Sennett

120 West Tenth Street

Erie, PA 16501

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ORDER indicating that that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), this matter is remanded to the Court of Common Pleas of Mercer County, forthwith; that the initial case management conference scheduled for 12/13/18 at 3:00 p.m. is cancelled; that the Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED and serve a certified copy of this Order on the Prothonotary for the Court of Common Pleas of Mercer County, forthwith. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/12/18. (jg) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#24

(#24) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #23 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines, Set Response filed by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#23

(#23) ORDER indicating that upon consideration of Plaintiff GFM 23, LLC's Emergency Motion to Appoint Receiver Pendente Lite, (Docket No. #10 ), its Supporting Brief, (Docket No. #11 ), and Defendant Iowa Square Realty, LLC's Memorandum in Opposition, (Docket No. #21 ), Plaintiff's Motion #10 is DENIED, without prejudice; a Rule to Show Cause is issued upon the parties to show cause by December 12, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. why this matter should not be remanded to the Court of Common Pleas for Mercer County (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/10/2018. (bdk) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

21 #2

Proposed Order

21 #1

Affidavit Jelson Santos

#21

(#21) BRIEF in Opposition re #10 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver Pendente Lite with Certificate of Service filed by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jelson Santos, #2 Proposed Order) (Claypool, Mark) Modified text on 12/10/2018 to correct title of event selected. (ept) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#20

(#20) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#11

(#23) ORDER indicating that upon consideration of Plaintiff GFM 23, LLC's Emergency Motion to Appoint Receiver Pendente Lite, (Docket No. #10 ), its Supporting Brief, (Docket No. #11 ), and Defendant Iowa Square Realty, LLC's Memorandum in Opposition, (Docket No. #21 ), Plaintiff's Motion #10 is DENIED, without prejudice; a Rule to Show Cause is issued upon the parties to show cause by December 12, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. why this matter should not be remanded to the Court of Common Pleas for Mercer County (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/10/2018. (bdk) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#6

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Affidavit of Service by GFM 23, LLC (McConnell, William) Modified on 11/21/2018 to add document linkage. (ept) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC re #3 Order, #2 Notice of ADR Designation, (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#3

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC re #3 Order, #2 Notice of ADR Designation, (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#2

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC re #3 Order, #2 Notice of ADR Designation, (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Mercer County, case number 2018-3258 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4932013), filed by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/15/2018) (ept). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Remark: Certified copy of #25 Order mailed to Court of Common Pleas of Mercer County. (ept) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER indicating that that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), this matter is remanded to the Court of Common Pleas of Mercer County, forthwith; that the initial case management conference scheduled for 12/13/18 at 3:00 p.m. is cancelled; that the Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED and serve a certified copy of this Order on the Prothonotary for the Court of Common Pleas of Mercer County, forthwith. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/12/18. (jg) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #23 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines, Set Response filed by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER indicating that upon consideration of Plaintiff GFM 23, LLC's Emergency Motion to Appoint Receiver Pendente Lite, (Docket No. #10 ), its Supporting Brief, (Docket No. #11 ), and Defendant Iowa Square Realty, LLC's Memorandum in Opposition, (Docket No. #21 ), Plaintiff's Motion #10 is DENIED, without prejudice; a Rule to Show Cause is issued upon the parties to show cause by December 12, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. why this matter should not be remanded to the Court of Common Pleas for Mercer County (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/10/2018. (bdk) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) BRIEF in Opposition re #10 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver Pendente Lite with Certificate of Service filed by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jelson Santos, #2 Proposed Order) (Claypool, Mark) Modified text on 12/10/2018 to correct title of event selected. (ept) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #18 Consent Motion to Allow Participation in Initial Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference by Phone; that Joshua S. Hackman, Esquire, Raymond A. Quaglia, Esquire, and Clifford Sacalis, Esquire may participate in the conference telephonically. The Court shall place the call. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/6/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #14 Certificate of Service, #13 Proposed Order. ERROR: Documents were not linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate documents. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Consent MOTION to Allow Participation in Initial Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference by Telephone re #8 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver Pendente Lite by GFM 23, LLC. (McConnell, William) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the parties' Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process are due by 12/6/18; A Case Management Conference is set for 12/13/18 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 5B before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jg) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Affidavit of Service by GFM 23, LLC (McConnell, William) Modified on 11/21/2018 to add document linkage. (ept) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by GFM 23, LLC Affiant: Audreann M. Buzzeo. (McConnell, William) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC re #3 Order, #2 Notice of ADR Designation, (Claypool, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/15/18. (jg) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Mercer County, case number 2018-3258 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4932013), filed by IOWA SQUARE REALTY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/15/2018) (ept). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Iowa Square Realty LLC, a New York limited liability company is a litigant