This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2018 at 07:48:12 (UTC).

Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc. et al v. Kemp

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Kemp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04727

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc.

Georgia State Conference of the NAACP

Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc.

Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc.

New Georgia Project, Inc.

ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.

The Joseph and Evelyn Lowery Institute for Justice and Human Rights, Inc.

Common Cause

Defendant

Brian Kemp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan Ludington Sells

Attorney at The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

P.O. Box 5493, 1226 Springdale Road, Ne

Atlanta, GA 31107-0493

Ezra David Rosenberg

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Suite 900, 1500 K. Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Julie Marie Houk

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Suite 900, 1500 K. Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

John Michael Powers

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Suite 900, 1500 K. Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

J. Gerald Hebert

Attorney at Campaign Legal Center

1411 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Danielle M. Lang

Attorney at Campaign Legal Center

1411 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Vilia Hayes

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Gregory Farrell

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Phi Nguyen

Attorney at Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta

Suite 148, 5680 Oakbrook Pkwy.

Norcross, GA 30093

Jon M. Greenbaum

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Suite 900, 1500 K. Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Mark P. Gaber

Attorney at Campaign Legal Center

1411 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Kristen Clarke

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Suite 400, 1401 New York Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorney

Cristina Correia

Attorney at Attorney General's Office-Atl

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

17 #13

Exhibit 12 - declaration of Maria del Rosario Palacios

17 #12

Exhibit 11 - declaration of Harvey Soto

17 #11

Exhibit 10 - declaration of Dr. Michael P. McDonald

17 #10

Exhibit 9 - Letter from Thomas E. Perez

17 #8

Exhibit 7 - Georgia Registrar Official Certification materials

17 #7

Exhibit 6 - Section 5 submission

17 #6

Exhibit 5 - declaration of Tamieka Atkins

17 #5

Exhibit 4 - declaration of Phyllis Blake

17 #4

Exhibit 3 - declaration of Stephanie Cho

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice Letter

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - SSA Report

#1

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketRefund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 11/5/18 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. #17 ]; and GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Corrected Brief [Doc. #24 ]. The Court DECLARES as follows: For individuals who have been flagged and placed in pending status due to citizenship, these individuals may vote in the November 6, 2018 election in these ways: [See Order for details.] The Court ISSUES the following INJUNCTION: The Court HEREBY DIRECTS Brian Kemp, in his official capacity as the Secretary of State, to act immediately, as follows: [See Order for details.] Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/2/2018. (cmd) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Approval re #32 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-8201742. (Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc., The Joseph and Evelyn Lowery Institute for Justice and Human Rights, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sixth Circuit opinion in Husted)(Powers, John) Modified on 11/1/2018 to edit text. (cmd) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eleanor L. Ross: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2018 re Plaintiffs' #17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Court called to order. The parties introduced themselves. Plaintiffs' counsel addressed the Court and briefly outlined the issues. Plaintiffs' witnesses Helen Butler, Stephanie Cho and Nicholas Marshall-Butler were sworn and provided testimony. Counsel provided arguments. The Court took the issue UNDER ADVISEMENT and will prepare an order memorializing its rulings. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Cohn)(cmd) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE Of Filing by Brian Kemp re #22 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rick Barron Declaration, #2 Exhibit October 2018 Training Document)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on 10/29/2018 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/29/2018. (cmd) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY BRIEF re #17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc., The Joseph and Evelyn Lowery Institute for Justice and Human Rights, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 23 bulletin, #2 Exhibit B - declaration of Yotam Oren, #3 Exhibit C - declaration of Nick Marshall, #4 Exhibit D - NVRA notice letter, #5 Exhibit E - declaration of Diana Cofield, #6 Exhibit F - supplemental declaration of Helen Butler)(Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Intent to Present Oral Testimony by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc., The Joseph and Evelyn Lowery Institute for Justice and Human Rights, Inc. re #19 Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Sells, Bryan) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit text. (cmd) (Entered: 10/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (cmd) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing to J. Gerald Hebert as to New Georgia Project, Inc. regarding #7 Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (mlb) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission of Mark P. Gaber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203994)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for Admission of Danielle M. Lang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203971)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203943)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for Admission of John Michael Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203904)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc. (Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of the #1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (aaq) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., New Georgia Project, Inc. and Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8201820) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SSA Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Georgia State Conference of the NAACP is a litigant

Latest cases where The New Georgia Project is a litigant