This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 07:01:04 (UTC).

George v. On-Site, RealPage Inc

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 George filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against On-Site, RealPage Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-06961

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chauncey George

Defendants

RealPage, Inc.

RP On-Site LLC

RealPage Inc

On-Site

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kari Annette Rudd

Attorney at Bay Area Legal Aid

1800 Market Street, 3Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Juliana Clare Fredman

Attorney at Bay Area Legal Aid

1800 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Craig Davis

Attorney at Law Offices of Craig Davis

912 Cole Street, Ste 102

San Francisco, CA 94117

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

11682 El Camino Real, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92130

Ronald Irvin Raether, Jr.

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1400

Irvine, CA 92614-2545

Jonathan Hing Yee

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1400

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Standing Order

#12

(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 2/25/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint byOn-Site, RealPage Inc. (Lohr, Jessica) (Filed on 12/7/2018) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Chauncey George (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 11/30/2018) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chauncey George.. (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 11/30/2018) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by On-Site, RealPage Inc.. (Lohr, Jessica) (Filed on 11/30/2018) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by On-Site, RealPage Inc (Lohr, Jessica) (Filed on 11/19/2018) Modified on 11/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by On-Site, RealPage Inc identifying Corporate Parent RealPage, Inc. for RP On-Site LLC. (Lohr, Jessica) (Filed on 11/16/2018) Modified on 11/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, San Francisco County. Their case number is CGC-18-570503. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12854362). Filed by On-Site, RealPage Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lohr, Jessica) (Filed on 11/16/2018) Modified on 11/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 2/25/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint byOn-Site, RealPage Inc. (Lohr, Jessica) (Filed on 12/7/2018) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • (#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Chauncey George (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 11/30/2018) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chauncey George.. (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 11/30/2018) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by On-Site, RealPage Inc.. (Lohr, Jessica) (Filed on 11/30/2018) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by On-Site, RealPage Inc (Lohr, Jessica) (Filed on 11/19/2018) Modified on 11/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/30/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by On-Site, RealPage Inc identifying Corporate Parent RealPage, Inc. for RP On-Site LLC. (Lohr, Jessica) (Filed on 11/16/2018) Modified on 11/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, San Francisco County. Their case number is CGC-18-570503. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12854362). Filed by On-Site, RealPage Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lohr, Jessica) (Filed on 11/16/2018) Modified on 11/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RP On-Site LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RealPage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald I. Raether, Jr.