This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2018 at 07:32:15 (UTC).

Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Ruckman et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ruckman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cam Ferenbach and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01470

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company

Defendants

Estate of Eric J. Ruckman

Natalie M. Ruckman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas S. Stewart

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak Stewart, PC

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 1500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Russell S. Buhite

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

1201 Third Avenue, Ste. 5150

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Reese R. Boyd, III

Attorney at Davis & Boyd, LLC

1110 London St., Suite 201

Myrtle Beach, SC 29577

Thomas Grover

10155 W. Twain Ave, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89147

Roman C. Harper

Attorney at Goodsel & Olsen, LLP

10155 W. Twain Ave., Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89147

Michael A Olsen

Attorney at Goodsell & Olsen, LLP

10155 W. Twain Ave., Ste. 100

Las Vegas, NV 89147

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #3 Complaint,,, filed by Natalie M. Ruckman. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/15/2018.(Olsen, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell S. Buhite for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel Thomas Scott Stewart. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/20/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company re #3 Complaint,,,. Estate of Eric J. Ruckman served on 9/8/2018, answer due 9/29/2018. (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company re #3 Complaint,,,. Natalie M. Ruckman served on 9/8/2018, answer due 9/29/2018. (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

10 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

10 #4

Exhibit 4 - Letter dated May 5, 2018 from Reese Boyd to Genworth Life Insurance

10 #3

Exhibit 3 - Proof of Loss Claimant Statement dated August 23, 2016 and Death Cer

10 #1

Exhibit 1 - Life Insurance Policy 5597691

#7

(#7) View Corrected Image #9 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Russell S. Buhite and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Thomas Scott Stewart (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5210991) by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Stewart, Thomas) Modified on 9/4/2018 (RFJ). (Entered: 08/23/2018)

3 #8

Summons Estate of Eric J. Ruckman

3 #7

Summons Natalie M. Ruckman

3 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

3 #5

Exhibit 4 - Letter from R. Boyd to Genworth (5-5-18)

3 #4

Exhibit 3 - Proof of Loss Claimant Statement

3 #3

Exhibit 2 - Stipulation & Order Modifying Divorce Decree

3 #2

Exhibit 1 (Pt. 2) - Life Insurance Policy 5597691

3 #1

Exhibit 1 (Pt. 1) - Life Insurance Policy 5597691

#3

(#3) VIEW Corrected Iamge #10 as to COMPLAINT against Estate of Eric J. Ruckman, Natalie M. Ruckman (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5189655) by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 Life Insurance Policy 5597691, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 Life Insurance Policy 5597691, #3 Exhibit 2 Divorce Decree, #4 Exhibit 3 Proof of Loss Claimant Statement, #5 Exhibit 4 Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Natalie M. Ruckman, #8 Summons Estate of Eric J. Ruckman)(Stewart, Thomas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/09/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • (#17) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IA 11-1 and IC 2-1. The Court has no record of Roman C. Harper being admitted to the U.S. District Courts bar and the attorney is not registered with CM/ECF. Attorney is advised to comply with the admission requirements of this Court. Admission forms are available on the Court's website at: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon complying with LR IA 11-1, you are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • (#16) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Thomas R. Grover is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • (#15) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Reese R. Boyd, III to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/16/2018. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #3 Complaint,,, filed by Natalie M. Ruckman. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/15/2018.(Olsen, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell S. Buhite for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel Thomas Scott Stewart. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/20/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company re #3 Complaint,,,. Estate of Eric J. Ruckman served on 9/8/2018, answer due 9/29/2018. (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company re #3 Complaint,,,. Natalie M. Ruckman served on 9/8/2018, answer due 9/29/2018. (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #3 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Life Insurance Policy 5597691, #2 Exhibit 2 Decree of Divorce, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Loss Claimant Statement and Death Certificate of Eric J. Ruckman, #4 Exhibit 4 Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 8 Minute Order,, #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/24/2018. Re: #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition,IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Russell S. Buhite counsel for plaintiff is directed to attach certificate of good standings from Florida, Alaska, Missouri and Oregon to petitioner's Verified Petition (#7) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF.Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Buhite's Verified Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) View Corrected Image #9 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Russell S. Buhite and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Thomas Scott Stewart (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5210991) by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Stewart, Thomas) Modified on 9/4/2018 (RFJ). (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Genworth Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Genworth Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Genworth Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent Genworth North America Corp. for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company added. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #3 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Russell S. Buhite to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/23/2018. (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) VIEW Corrected Iamge #10 as to COMPLAINT against Estate of Eric J. Ruckman, Natalie M. Ruckman (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5189655) by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 Life Insurance Policy 5597691, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 Life Insurance Policy 5597691, #3 Exhibit 2 Divorce Decree, #4 Exhibit 3 Proof of Loss Claimant Statement, #5 Exhibit 4 Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Natalie M. Ruckman, #8 Summons Estate of Eric J. Ruckman)(Stewart, Thomas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #1 using the appropriate docket entry title (Complaint) and pay the filing fee. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ERROR: Incorrect event selected by attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile as a "Complaint" and pay the filing fee. Document #1 is terminated. INTERPLEADER by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Pt. 1) - Life Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit 1 (Pt. 2) - Life Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 - Stipulation & Order Modifying Divorce Decree, #4 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Loss Claimant Statement, #5 Exhibit 4 - R. Boyd Letter to Genworth Life (5-5-18), #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #7 Summons Natalie Ruckman, #8 Index Estate of Eric J. Ruckman)(Stewart, Thomas) Modified on 8/9/2018 (DKJ). (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.