This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2018 at 07:48:46 (UTC).

Gentry v. DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 Gentry filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against DeQueen Eastern Railroad, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00224

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benny Wayne Gentry

Defendants

DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC

Patriot Rail Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Logan Jones

Attorney at Jones Brown, PLLC

616 S Boston Ave, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74119

T. Wesley Shumate

Attorney at Davis Bethune & Jones, LLC

1100 Main St, Ste 2930

Kansas City, MO 64105

Timothy Gaarder

Attorney at Davis Bethune & Jones, LLC

1100 Main St, Ste 2930

Kansas City, MO 64105

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Erwin Smith

Attorney at Gungoll Jackson Box & Devoll (OKC)

101 Park Ave, Ste 1400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8273

John P. Lord

Attorney at Williams Venker & Sanders, LLC

100 N Broadway St, Ste 2100

St Louis, MO 63119

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing the parties exchange and file their disclosures and joint status report no later than 10/1/2018(lal, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#14

(#14) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC (Lord, John) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Erwin Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent SteelRiver Infrastructure Fund North America LP for Patriot Rail Company, LLC; Corporate Parent Tennessee Southern Railroad Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Patriot Rail Transportation Company LLC, Corporate Parent SteelRiver Infrastructure Fund North America LP for DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC) by DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC (Lord, John) Modified on 8/14/2018: correcting corp parents (nm, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John P. Lord on behalf of DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC (Lord, John) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by T. Wesley Shumate on behalf of Benny Wayne Gentry (Shumate, T.) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Gaarder on behalf of Benny Wayne Gentry (Gaarder, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

7 #1

Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#7

(#7) MOTION for Attorney Travis Wesley Shumate to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1193834) by Benny Wayne Gentry (With attachments) Responses due by 8/6/2018(Jones, Logan) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

6 #1

Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#6

(#6) MOTION for Attorney Timothy Crowe Gaarder to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1193821) by Benny Wayne Gentry (With attachments) Responses due by 8/6/2018(Jones, Logan) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patriot Rail Company, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC by Benny Wayne Gentry (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Benny Wayne Gentry (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing the parties exchange and file their disclosures and joint status report no later than 10/1/2018(lal, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC (Lord, John) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Erwin Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent SteelRiver Infrastructure Fund North America LP for Patriot Rail Company, LLC; Corporate Parent Tennessee Southern Railroad Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Patriot Rail Transportation Company LLC, Corporate Parent SteelRiver Infrastructure Fund North America LP for DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC) by DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC (Lord, John) Modified on 8/14/2018: correcting corp parents (nm, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John P. Lord on behalf of DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC (Lord, John) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by T. Wesley Shumate on behalf of Benny Wayne Gentry (Shumate, T.) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Gaarder on behalf of Benny Wayne Gentry (Gaarder, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Timothy Crowe Gaarder and #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney T. Wesley Shumate for Benny Wayne Gentry, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicants within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Attorney Travis Wesley Shumate to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1193834) by Benny Wayne Gentry (With attachments) Responses due by 8/6/2018(Jones, Logan) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Attorney Timothy Crowe Gaarder to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1193821) by Benny Wayne Gentry (With attachments) Responses due by 8/6/2018(Jones, Logan) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patriot Rail Company, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/17/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1192399 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Benny Wayne Gentry (sms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 7/24/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC by Benny Wayne Gentry (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Benny Wayne Gentry (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less