This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2019 at 19:18:42 (UTC).

Genentech, Inc. et al v. Amgen Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 Genentech, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amgen Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory M. Sleet, Colm F. Connolly and Sherry R. Fallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-01407

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sherry R. Fallon

Presiding Judges

Gregory M. Sleet

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Genentech, Inc.

City of Hope

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Amgen Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Michael P. Kelly

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Thomas S. Fletcher

Charles L. McCloud

Daralyn J. Durie

Jingyuan Luo

Kyle E. Thomason

Benjamin A. Smyth

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Eneda Hoxha

Teagan J. Gregory

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DE 20005

Jonathan S. Sidhu

Sumeet P. Dang

David I. Berl

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Melanie K. Sharp

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

James L. Higgins

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Siegmund Y. Gutman

Steven M. Bauer

Thomas Lavery, IV

Michelle Marie Ovanesian

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kimberly A. Mottley

21 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#616

#615

#614

#613

#612

#611

610 #1

Exhibit 1

#610

#602

#4

#3

1 #5

Attachments A & B to Motion

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Defendant Amgen's Proposed Order

1 #1

Plaintiff's Proposed Order

#1

794 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketSO ORDERED- re (472 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC-SRF, 616 in 1:17-cv-01407-CFC-SRF) Joint MOTION for Discovery Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for Amgen Inc. shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: Moving submission due by no later than close of business on 1/13/2020; Responsive submission due by no later than close of business on 1/14/2020.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01407-CFC-SRF, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC-SRF(lih) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#616) Joint MOTION for Discovery Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Amgen Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ormerod, Eve) Modified on 12/30/2019 (lih). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#615) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFFS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO AMGEN INC.S INTERROGATORY NO. 2; (2) GENENTECH, INC.S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO AMGEN INC.S INTERROGATORY No. 20 filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#614) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amgen Inc.'s Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Genentech's Interrogatories No. 13 filed by Amgen Inc..(Higgins, James) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#613) SO ORDERED, re #612 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines Relating to Expert Reports and Summary Judgment. ORDER, Re-Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2020., Answering Briefs due 7/31/2020., Reply Briefs due 8/7/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/17/2019. (nmf) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#612) STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines Relating to Expert Reports and Summary Judgment by Amgen Inc.. (Higgins, James) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#611) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Timothy Schwartz on December 17, 2019 [AMENDED] filed by Amgen Inc..(Higgins, James) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#610) Second NOTICE of Certifications of Compliance with Court Order Regarding Boehringer Document (D.I. 595) by Amgen Inc. re #602 SO ORDERED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Higgins, James) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#609) Amended NOTICE of Deposition of Venkata Suresh Vunnum by Genentech, Inc. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Stephanie Lin for City of Hope and Genentech, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
736 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRemark : Exit copies to Duty Judge (GMS) pending arrival of hard copies from filer. (rwc) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amgen Inc. on 10/10/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,574,869; 8,633,302; 8,710,196; 9,441,035; 9,487,809. (rwc) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,807,799; 7,923,221; 8,044,017; 8,460,895; 8,512,983. (rwc) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,060,269; 7,169,901; 7,375,193; 7,622,115. (rwc) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,417,335; 6,586,206; 6,620,918; 6,870,034; 6,884,879. (rwc) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,054,297; 6,121,428; 6,242,177; 6,331,415; 6,407,213. (rwc) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) [SEALED] COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Amgen Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2240035.) - filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Exhibit G-K, #3 Exhibit L-N, #4 Exhibit O-R, #5 Exhibit S-W, #6 Exhibit X. (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Seal Complaint - filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Proposed Order, #2 Defendant Amgen's Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2017: #4 Certificate of Service) (rwc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2017: #5 Attachments A & B to Motion) (rwc). (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amgen Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Genentech, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Siegmund Y Gutman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L. Higgins