This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:58:19 (UTC).

Gatti et al v. Nevil et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Gatti filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Nevil. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Malachy E Mannion. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01922

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malachy E Mannion

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ida Gatti

Ronald Gatti, Jr.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Peters Consultants, Inc.

Bettyanne Nevil

Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc.

Wayco, Inc.

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant

Wayco, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendant

Axtell's, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James J Amato

Attorney at Fanelli, Evans & Patel, P.C.

1 Mahantongo Street

Pottsville, PA 17901

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Frederick M. Brehm

Attorney at Brehm, Nofer & McCarter, P.C.

161 Washington Street, 8 Tower Bridge, Suite 1450

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Christine L Kochel

Attorney at Forry Ullman

150 South Warner Road, Suite #450

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

Joseph E. Janc

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER, P.C.

415 Wyoming Avenue

Scranton, PA 18503

James J. Dodd-o

Attorney at Thomas, Thomas & Hafer, LLP

1550 Pond Road, Suite 210

Allentown, PA 18104

Paraskevoula Mamounas

Attorney at Thomas, Thomas & Hafer LLP

1550 Pond Road, Suite 210

Allentown, PA 18104

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) AMENDED THIRD Party Summons Issued as to Axtell's, Inc. (bg) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#20

(#20) THIRD Party Summons Issued as to Axtell's, Inc.. (bg) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2018 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/26/18. (bs) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#18

(#18) Defendant Nevil's ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Penn Estate Property by Bettyanne Nevil.(Kochel, Christine) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#17

(#17) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Axtell's, Inc., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Axtell's, Inc., filed by Wayco, Inc..(Mamounas, Paraskevoula) Modified on 11/21/2018 (bs). (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Bettyanne Nevil, Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc., Peters Consultants, Inc. by Wayco, Inc..(Mamounas, Paraskevoula) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

14 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Bettyanne Nevil, Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc., Wayco, Inc. by Peters Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2)(Brehm, Frederick) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Bettyanne Nevil, Peters Consultants, Inc., Wayco, Inc. by Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc..(Janc, Joseph) Modified on 11/19/2018 (bs). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ronald Gatti, Jr, Ida Gatti. Peters Consultants, Inc. waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Amato, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ronald Gatti, Jr, Ida Gatti. Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Amato, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ronald Gatti, Jr, Ida Gatti. Bettyanne Nevil waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Amato, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#4

(#4) Defendant Nevil's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc., Peters Consultants, Inc., Wayco, Inc. by Bettyanne Nevil.(Kochel, Christine) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/3/18. (bs) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Bettyanne Nevil, Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc., Peters Consultants, Inc., Wayco, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Bettyanne Nevil, Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc., Wayco, Inc. by Peters Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2)(Brehm, Frederick) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Per Counsel's Request- Document No. 22 has been deleted. Document filed in error. (ve) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) AMENDED THIRD Party Summons Issued as to Axtell's, Inc. (bg) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) THIRD Party Summons Issued as to Axtell's, Inc.. (bg) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2018 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/26/18. (bs) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Defendant Nevil's ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Penn Estate Property by Bettyanne Nevil.(Kochel, Christine) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Axtell's, Inc., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Axtell's, Inc., filed by Wayco, Inc..(Mamounas, Paraskevoula) Modified on 11/21/2018 (bs). (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Bettyanne Nevil, Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc., Peters Consultants, Inc. by Wayco, Inc..(Mamounas, Paraskevoula) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Defendant Nevil's ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Peter Consultants by Bettyanne Nevil.(Kochel, Christine) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Bettyanne Nevil, Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc., Wayco, Inc. by Peters Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2)(Brehm, Frederick) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Bettyanne Nevil, Peters Consultants, Inc., Wayco, Inc. by Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc..(Janc, Joseph) Modified on 11/19/2018 (bs). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Paraskevoula Mamounas on behalf of Wayco, Inc. (Mamounas, Paraskevoula) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Dodd-o on behalf of Wayco, Inc. (Dodd-o, James) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ronald Gatti, Jr, Ida Gatti. Wayco, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Amato, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ronald Gatti, Jr, Ida Gatti. Peters Consultants, Inc. waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Amato, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ronald Gatti, Jr, Ida Gatti. Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Amato, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ronald Gatti, Jr, Ida Gatti. Bettyanne Nevil waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Amato, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant Nevil's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc., Peters Consultants, Inc., Wayco, Inc. by Bettyanne Nevil.(Kochel, Christine) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/3/18. (bs) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Bettyanne Nevil, Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc., Peters Consultants, Inc., Wayco, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Bettyanne Nevil, Penn Estates Property Owners Association, Inc., Peters Consultants, Inc., Wayco, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4560041), filed by Ida Gatti, Ronald Gatti, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.