This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 19:40:05 (UTC).

Gary v. Carbon Cycle Arizona LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 Gary filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Carbon Cycle Arizona LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Teilborg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02796

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James A Teilborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Michael Gary

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Tom Mulholland

Samuel W Grossman

Jerry Kovacich

Broomfield, CO 80020

Carbon Cycle Holdings LLC

Carlos E Sala

Carbon Cycle Arizona LLC

Carbon Cycle Energy LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jason Saul Barrat

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

14500 N Northsight Blvd., Ste. 133

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Michael David Zoldan

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

14500 N Northsight Blvd., Ste. 133

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Jessica Elizabeth Miller

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

14500 N Northsight Blvd., Ste. 133

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

James Joseph Weiler

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

14500 N Northsight Blvd., Ste. 133

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Joshua William Carden

Attorney at Joshua Carden Law Firm PC - Scottsdale, AZ

16427 N Scottsdale Rd., Ste. 410

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

 

Court Documents

50 #8

Text of Proposed Order

50 #7

Exhibit Attachment C

50 #6

Exhibit Attachment B

50 #5

Exhibit Attachment A

50 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

50 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

50 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

50 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#50

2 #6

Summons

2 #5

Summons

2 #4

Summons

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

114 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER that Defendants' request for an evidentiary hearing pursuant to LRCiv 54.2(h) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs #50 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as follows: 1. Plaintiff's request for taxable costs is denied. 2. Plaintiff is awarded $4.00 in non-taxable costs. 3. Plaintiff is awarded $13,167.67 in attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/16/19. (CLB) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to Plaintiff having accepted Defendant's offer of judgment, judgment is hereby entered against Defendant Samuel Grossman in the amount of $250.00 (exclusive of taxable court costs and attorney's fees) and this action is hereby terminated. (SLQ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Michael Gary . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER denying #61 Motion for Order to Show Cause and Motion to Supplement. [See attached order for additional information.] Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/19/2019. (RMW) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #61 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION to Supplement filed by Carbon Cycle Arizona LLC, Carbon Cycle Energy LLC, Carbon Cycle Holdings LLC, Jerry Kovacich, Tom Mulholland. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carden, Joshua) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MOTION for Order to Show Cause , MOTION to Supplement by Michael Gary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Michael Gary. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Samuel W Grossman.(DXD) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER granting #54 Motion to Set Aside Default and Motion for Leave to Amend. The Clerk's Entry of Default (Doc. #20 ) is set aside as to Defendant Samuel Grossman. The Clerk shall file the Answer Lodged at Doc. #55 . Mr. Grossman's time to file his Initial MIDP Disclosures shall be calculated from the filing date of his Answer. The deadlines set forth in the 12/20/2018 Rule 16 Scheduling Order remain otherwise unchanged. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/14/19. (DXD) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #50 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michael Gary. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michael Gary: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Verified Complaint, Notice to Parties, General Order, Mandatory Initial Discovery, Order upon Carbon Cycle Arizona, LLC on 10/11/18. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified text on 10/15/2018 (REK). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the application for entry of default (Doc. #8 ) is denied without prejudice because there is no proof of service in the record. Ordered by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/3/18. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) *DENIED per Order 9 * APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Michael Gary against Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Barrat, Jason) Modified on 10/3/2018 (MAW). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Complaint/Summons by Michael Gary . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Attachment A, #3 Exhibit Attachment B)(Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, if not already accomplished prior to the date of this Order, that Plaintiff(s) shall effect service of the Complaint and Summons upon all Defendants no later than 90 days after the filing of the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must comply with Gen. Ord. No. 17-08 (D. Ariz. Apr. 14, 2017) regarding the mandatory initial discovery responses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant(s) with a copy of this Order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/6/18. (MAW) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Carbon Cycle Arizona LLC, Carbon Cycle Energy LLC, Carbon Cycle Holdings LLC, Samuel W Grossman, Jerry Kovacich, Tom Mulholland, Carlos E Sala. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15922104. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02796-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Michael Gary. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MFR) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15922104 filed by Michael Gary. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua William Carden