This case was last updated from PACER on 01/28/2019 at 07:48:18 (UTC).

Garvin v. City of Charleston, Mississippi et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Garvin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Charleston, Mississippi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Sharion Aycock. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00255

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Sharion Aycock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Garvin

Defendants

Tim Cole

Wendy Jones

Tallahatchie County, Mississippi

City of Charleston, Mississippi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chaka Denise Smith

Attorney at OFFICE OF CHAKA SMITH, PLLC

151 South Gaines Hwy.

Boyle, MS 38730-9998

Defendant Attorneys

Wilton V. Byars, III

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL

P.O. Box 1396

Oxford, MS 38655

Tiffany Nicole Carey

Attorney at DANIEL COKER HORTON & BELL, P.A.

265 N. Lamar Blvd., Suite R

Oxford, MS 38655

Gregory Todd Butler

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 16114

Jackson, MS 39236-6114

Howard David Clark, III

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP

P.O. Box 16114

Jackson, MS 39236-6114

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Tallahatchie County, Mississippi. (Carey, Tiffany)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Tallahatchie County's Initial Disclosures by Tiffany Nicole Carey on behalf of Tallahatchie County, Mississippi to Terry Garvin. (Carey, Tiffany)

#14

(#14) First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Terry Garvin. (Smith, Chaka)

#13

(#13) Defendant's ANSWER to State Court Complaint by City of Charleston, Mississippi. (Clark, Howard)

#12

(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Tim Cole and Wendy Jones (jla)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Tallahatchie County, Mississippi. (Byars, Wilton)

#10

(#10) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/30/18. (rtc)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Charleston, Mississippi answer due 1/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/30/18. (cs)

8 #8

Exhibit State Court Record-Civil Cover Sheet

8 #7

Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Notice of Claim to City of Chrleston

8 #6

Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Notice of Claim to Tallahatchie County

8 #5

Exhibit State Trial Court-Record-Complaint

8 #4

Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Summons to City of Charleston

8 #3

Exhibit State Trial Court Record Summons to Tim Cole

8 #2

Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Summons to Wendy Jones

8 #1

Exhibit Summons to Tallahatchie County

#8

(#8) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons to Tallahatchie County, #2 Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Summons to Wendy Jones, #3 Exhibit State Trial Court Record Summons to Tim Cole, #4 Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Summons to City of Charleston, #5 Exhibit State Trial Court-Record-Complaint, #6 Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Notice of Claim to Tallahatchie County, #7 Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Notice of Claim to City of Chrleston, #8 Exhibit State Court Record-Civil Cover Sheet) (Butler, Gregory)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #2 Complaint - State Court by City of Charleston, Mississippi. (Clark, Howard) Modified on 11/30/2018 (jla).

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for January 28, 2019 until further notice. NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Tallahatchie County, Mississippi. (Carey, Tiffany)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Tallahatchie County's Initial Disclosures by Tiffany Nicole Carey on behalf of Tallahatchie County, Mississippi to Terry Garvin. (Carey, Tiffany)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Terry Garvin. (Smith, Chaka)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Defendant's ANSWER to State Court Complaint by City of Charleston, Mississippi. (Clark, Howard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Tim Cole and Wendy Jones (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Tallahatchie County, Mississippi. (Byars, Wilton)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/30/18. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Charleston, Mississippi answer due 1/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/30/18. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons to Tallahatchie County, #2 Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Summons to Wendy Jones, #3 Exhibit State Trial Court Record Summons to Tim Cole, #4 Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Summons to City of Charleston, #5 Exhibit State Trial Court-Record-Complaint, #6 Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Notice of Claim to Tallahatchie County, #7 Exhibit State Trial Court Record-Notice of Claim to City of Chrleston, #8 Exhibit State Court Record-Civil Cover Sheet) (Butler, Gregory)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany Nicole Carey on behalf of Tallahatchie County, Mississippi (Carey, Tiffany)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wilton V. Byars, III on behalf of Tallahatchie County, Mississippi (Byars, Wilton)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, of Tallahatchie County, MS. (Carey, Tiffany)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #2 Complaint - State Court by City of Charleston, Mississippi. (Clark, Howard) Modified on 11/30/2018 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of City of Charleston, Mississippi (Clark, Howard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab) Modified on 11/30/2018 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against City of Charleston, Mississippi, Tim Cole, Wendy Jones, Tallahatchie County, Mississippi, filed by Terry Garvin. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Charleston, Mississippi from Circuit Court of Tallahatchie County, Mississippi, case number CV-2018-0089-SMT1. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1621051) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by City of Charleston, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C Notice) (tab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab).

    Read MoreRead Less