This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2018 at 08:03:54 (UTC).

Garrett et al v Waupaca Foundry

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 Garrett filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Waupaca Foundry. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01186

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Darrell McCarthy

Jason Stallings

Thomas Marshall

Steven Bell

Terry Graham

Roger Howard

Anthony Owens

Joseph Leduff

James Lawson, JR.

Joseph Gillespie

Anthony Castello

John Aull

Matthew Milburn

Robert Gogel, Jr

Gerald Chamberlain

Mark Christian

Jermiah Sturgeon

Brandon Ford

Wesley Ball

Mark Sandage

120 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Gordon Rudd, Jr

Attorney at Zimmerman Reed PLLP

1100 Ids Center, 80 S Eighth St

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4123

T Joseph Snodgrass

Attorney at Larson King LLP

2800 Wells Fargo Pl, 30 E 7Th St

St Paul, MN 55101

Kyle Frederick Biesecker

Attorney at Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer LLC

411 Main St

Evansville, IN 47708

Other Attorneys

Joseph Louis Olson

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Patrick A. Shoulders

Attorney at ZIEMER STAYMAN WEITZEL & SHOULDERS

Po Box 916

Evansville, IN 47706

Michael D Bess

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

444 W Lake St - Ste 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

Paula R Jackson

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser & Holt

262 German Oak Dr

Cordova, TN 38018

J Russ Bryant

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser & Holt

262 German Oak Dr

Cordova, TN 38018

James L Holt, Jr

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser & Holt

262 German Oak Dr

Cordova, TN 38018

Paul E Benson

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Eric T Presnell

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1600 Division St - Ste 700

Nashville, TN 37203

Lee M Seese

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Wm Michael Schiff

Attorney at ZIEMER STAYMAN WEITZEL & SHOULDERS

P O Box 916

Evansville, IN 47706-0916

Gordon E Jackson

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser & Holt

262 German Oak Dr

Cordova, TN 38018

Benjamin A Kaplan

Attorney at Crueger Dickinson LLC

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Alexander M DeGuire

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Mitchell W Quick

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3300

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Patrick A Shoulders

Attorney at Ziemer Stayman Weitzel & Schoulders

Po Box 916

Evansville, IN 47706-0916

W Michael Schiff

Attorney at Ziemer Stayman Weitzel & Schoulders

Po Box 916

Evansville, IN 47706-0916

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) ORDER Severing Case - Originally docketed in the Eastern District of Wisconsin Case Number 1:08-cv-488-WCG. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 9/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

#2

(#2) Submission of Docket Sheet for Case #1:08-cv-488-WCG Eastern District of Wisconsin. (JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

3 #1

Attachment

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge William C. Griesbach for all further proceedings. This case is related to Eastern District of Wisconsin Case Number, 1:08-cv-488-WCG. Judge Richard L. Young no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/7/2017.(JD) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge William C. Griesbach. Judge Richard L. Young no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number, 3:17-cv-00140-WCG-MPB, on all future filings in this matter. (JD) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

#65

(#65) ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE PARTIES' PROPOSED SETTLEMENT signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/14/2018. Fairness Hearing set for 1/24/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

#64

(#64) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2018. The Court approves the preliminary settlement. The parties will submit a proposed order to the Court for e-filing. (Tape #091418) (lh)

#63

RESTRICTED

#62

(#62) DISCLOSURE Statement by Waupaca Foundry Inc. (Benson, Paul)

#61

(#61) LETTER to Eric Presnell regarding admission and ECF filing (sent via USPS) (jcl)

#60

(#60) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00140. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

60 #1

*Restricted*

#59

(#59) CLOSED TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin for settlement approval. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 8/1/2018.(TF) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

#58

(#58) Joint MOTION to Transfer Case for Purposes of Settlement Approval, filed by All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Minutes of 7/19/18 Telephonic Conference, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE PARTIES' PROPOSED SETTLEMENT signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/14/2018. Fairness Hearing set for 1/24/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2018. The Court approves the preliminary settlement. The parties will submit a proposed order to the Court for e-filing. (Tape #091418) (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Waupaca Foundry Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Benson, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) DISCLOSURE Statement by Waupaca Foundry Inc. (Benson, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) LETTER to Eric Presnell regarding admission and ECF filing (sent via USPS) (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00140. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) CLOSED TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin for settlement approval. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 8/1/2018.(TF) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) Joint MOTION to Transfer Case for Purposes of Settlement Approval, filed by All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Minutes of 7/19/18 Telephonic Conference, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Judge William C. Griesbach. The parties have reached a global settlement for the Indiana, Wisconsin, and Tennessee cases and will be seeking the transfer of the Tennessee case to EDWI. Upon approval of the transfer of the Tennessee case, the parties anticipate filing a settlement agreement by 7/30/2018 and a motion for preliminary approval by 8/2/2018. The Court grants the parties' request for a stay of all deadlines. The Telephone Status Conference in this matter set for 8/3/2018 09:00 AM is removed from the court calendar. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Shoulders on behalf of Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • (#9) Pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(a), this matter will proceed without the assignment of a magistrate judge. Please include the new case number: 3:17-cv-00140-WCG on all future filings in this matter. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 10/3/2017. (TEXT-ENTRY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)(NLR) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • (#8) RECEIPT #IP057098 for FILING fee in the amount of $400, paid by Attorney Thomas J. Snodgrass. (MEH) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • (#7) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b) the Honorable William C. Griesbach has been randomly assigned to perform the duties of the district judge in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana for this matter. (JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge William C. Griesbach. Judge Richard L. Young no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number, 3:17-cv-00140-WCG-MPB, on all future filings in this matter. (JD) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge William C. Griesbach for all further proceedings. This case is related to Eastern District of Wisconsin Case Number, 1:08-cv-488-WCG. Judge Richard L. Young no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/7/2017.(JD) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Submission of Docket Sheet for Case #1:08-cv-488-WCG Eastern District of Wisconsin. (JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ORDER Severing Case - Originally docketed in the Eastern District of Wisconsin Case Number 1:08-cv-488-WCG. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 9/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.