This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2019 at 07:32:54 (UTC).

Garcia v. Red Robin International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Red Robin International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04263

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Javier Garcia

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant

Red Robin International, Inc.

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 6400

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Swetha Sajja

Attorney at Daspit Law Firm

440 Louisiana St, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Russell Frontz

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1000 Louisiana St, Suite 6400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Red Robin International, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frontz, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN REMOVED ACTION by Red Robin International, Inc., filed. (Frontz, Matthew) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Red Robin International, Inc. identifying Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Frontz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Red Robin International, Inc. identifying Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Frontz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, 333rd Judicial District, case number 2018-48808 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21254145) filed by Red Robin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frontz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Red Robin International, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frontz, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN REMOVED ACTION by Red Robin International, Inc., filed. (Frontz, Matthew) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Red Robin International, Inc. identifying Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Frontz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Red Robin International, Inc. identifying Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Frontz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, 333rd Judicial District, case number 2018-48808 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21254145) filed by Red Robin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frontz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant