This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2018 at 07:50:29 (UTC).

Gamble v. Chevron Oronite Company LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 Gamble filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chevron Oronite Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry W Ashe and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-10102

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gordon Gamble

Defendants

Chevron Oronite Company LLC

Gary Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George Brian Recile

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Barry William Sartin, Jr.

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Defendant Attorneys

Kristen Lewis Hayes

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Beatriz Quintana Richmond

Attorney at Baker Donelson Beaerman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Houston)

201 St. Charles Ave., 36Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Kenneth Marc Klemm

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

12 #1

Memorandum in Support

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

8 #2

Exhibit A

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#4

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court Record

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gary Thomas. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Hayes, Kristen) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Chevron Oronite Company LLC.(Hayes, Kristen) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Chevron Oronite Company LLC, Gary Thomas; answer due 12/11/2018. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/27/18. (clc) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Chevron Oronite Company LLC, Gary Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Kristen) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Chevron Oronite Company LLC, Gary Thomas, and Gordon Gamble. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Hayes, Kristen) Modified text/filers on 11/21/2018 (sa). (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chevron Oronite Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Chevron Corporation for Chevron Oronite Company LLC. (Hayes, Kristen) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Compliance by Chevron Oronite Company LLC, Gary Thomas re #1 Notice of Removal. (Hayes, Kristen) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Chevron Oronite Company LLC, Gary Thomas answer due 11/27/2018. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/6/18. (sbs) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Chevron Oronite Company LLC, Gary Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Kristen) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Gary Thomas, Chevron Oronite Company LLC. By the Clerk. (mm) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th Judicial District Court, Plaquemines Parish, Case Number 64-00807 A (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7199324) filed by Gary Thomas, Chevron Oronite Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleading, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Kristen Lewis Hayes added to party Chevron Oronite Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Lewis Hayes added to party Gary Thomas(pty:dft).(Hayes, Kristen) Modified text on 10/30/2018 (mm). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chevron Oronite Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry W Sartin, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George B Recile