This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2014 at 13:01:18 (UTC).

Gabriele v. Conagra Foods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Gabriele filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Conagra Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:14-CV-05183

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jared Gabriele

Defendant

Conagra Foods, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marcus Neil Bozeman

Attorney at Thrash Law Firm, P.A.

1101 Garland Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Kenneth R Shemin

Attorney at Shemin Law Firm, PLLC

3333 Pinnacle Hills Parkway, Suite 603

Rogers, AR 72758

Thomas P. Thrash

Attorney at Thrash Law Firm

1101 Garland Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin A. Crass

Attorney at Friday, Eldredge & Clark

2000 Regions Center, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3493

Roger Christopher Lawson

Attorney at Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP

3425 N. Futrall, Suite 103

Fayetteville, AR 72703

Angela M. Spivey

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1230 Peachtree Street Ne, Promenade Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#1

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #1 Complaint against All Defendants ConAgra Foods, Inc., filed by Jared Gabriele. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jared Gabriele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Shemin, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jared Gabriele. (src) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished (src) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

5 #1

Exhibit 1

5 #2

Exhibit 2

#5

(#8) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Class Action Complaint by Conagra Foods, Inc..(Lawson, Roger) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

#6

(#7) CLERK'S ORDER re #6 Stipulation filed by Conagra Foods, Inc., Jared Gabriele extending time to answer. Conagra Foods, Inc. answer due 8/18/2014. (src) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S ORDER re #6 Stipulation filed by Conagra Foods, Inc., Jared Gabriele extending time to answer. Conagra Foods, Inc. answer due 8/18/2014. (src) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Certify Class by Jared Gabriele. Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Product Labels, #2 Exhibit Scarbrough Declaration, #3 Exhibit May Declaration, #4 Exhibit Myers v. Malone & Hyde, #5 Exhibit Werdebaugh v. Blue Diamond, #6 Exhibit Ries v. Arizona Beverages, #7 Exhibit Johnson v. General Mills, #8 Exhibit Astiana v. Kashi, #9 Exhibit Lilly v. Jamba Juice, #10 Exhibit Lanovaz v. Twinings, #11 Exhibit Brazil v. Dole #1, #12 Exhibit Brazil v. Dole #2, #13 Exhibit Brazil v. Dole #3, #14 Exhibit Brown v. Hain Celestial, #15 Exhibit Forcellati v. Hyland's, #16 Exhibit McCrary v. The Elations Co, #17 Exhibit Guido v. L'Oreal, #18 Exhibit Ortega v. Natural Balance, #19 Exhibit Affidavit of Jared Gabriele, #20 Exhibit Class Counsel Affidavits)(Thrash, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

22 #4

Exhibit Myers v. Malone & Hyde

22 #5

Exhibit Werdebaugh v. Blue Diamond

22 #2

Exhibit Scarbrough Declaration

22 #3

Exhibit May Declaration

22 #1

Exhibit Product Labels

22 #20

Exhibit Class Counsel Affidavits

22 #19

Exhibit Affidavit of Jared Gabriele

22 #18

Exhibit Ortega v. Natural Balance

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #22 MOTION to Certify Class by Jared Gabriele. (Thrash, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Certify Class by Jared Gabriele. Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Product Labels, #2 Exhibit Scarbrough Declaration, #3 Exhibit May Declaration, #4 Exhibit Myers v. Malone & Hyde, #5 Exhibit Werdebaugh v. Blue Diamond, #6 Exhibit Ries v. Arizona Beverages, #7 Exhibit Johnson v. General Mills, #8 Exhibit Astiana v. Kashi, #9 Exhibit Lilly v. Jamba Juice, #10 Exhibit Lanovaz v. Twinings, #11 Exhibit Brazil v. Dole #1, #12 Exhibit Brazil v. Dole #2, #13 Exhibit Brazil v. Dole #3, #14 Exhibit Brown v. Hain Celestial, #15 Exhibit Forcellati v. Hyland's, #16 Exhibit McCrary v. The Elations Co, #17 Exhibit Guido v. L'Oreal, #18 Exhibit Ortega v. Natural Balance, #19 Exhibit Affidavit of Jared Gabriele, #20 Exhibit Class Counsel Affidavits)(Thrash, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 29, 2014. (rg) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting deadlines. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 22, 2014. (slc) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER denying #13 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 21, 2014. (jn) (Entered: 10/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before the Honorable Timothy L. Brooks with Honorable Erin L. Setser participating: Case Management Hearing held on 10/10/2014. (Dana Hayden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (gh) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 10/10/2014. (Dana Hayden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (gg) (Entered: 10/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. R. Trent Taylor is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 8, 2014. (ee) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Attorney R. Trent Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 5004494) by Conagra Foods, Inc. (tg) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting Hearings: Case Management Hearing set for 10/10/2014 11:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks.Out of area counsel will be permitted to participate via phone. Please provide your contact information to tlbinfo@arwd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 6, 2014. (slc) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Jared Gabriele. Conagra Foods, Inc. served on 7/7/2014, answer due 7/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shemin, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 10/3/2014 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/26/2014. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 11, 2014. (slc) (Entered: 08/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Class Action Complaint by Conagra Foods, Inc..(Lawson, Roger) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S ORDER re #6 Stipulation filed by Conagra Foods, Inc., Jared Gabriele extending time to answer. Conagra Foods, Inc. answer due 8/18/2014. (src) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION re #5 Amended Complaint, by Conagra Foods, Inc., Jared Gabriele. (Crass, Kevin) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #1 Complaint against All Defendants ConAgra Foods, Inc., filed by Jared Gabriele. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jared Gabriele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Shemin, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished (src) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Issued as to Conagra Foods, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (src) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jared Gabriele. (src) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Conagra Foods, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5004297), filed by Jared Gabriele.(src) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.