This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2023 at 06:35:47 (UTC).

In re Lantus Direct Purchaser Antitrust Litigation

Case Summary

On 12/30/2016 In re Lantus Direct Purchaser Antitrust Litigation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Judith G. Dein and Leo T. Sorokin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-12652

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Judith G. Dein

Presiding Judge

Leo T. Sorokin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FWK Holdings LLC

Meijer, Inc.

Meijer Distribution, Inc.

Intervenor Plaintiffs

RDC Liquidating Trust, by and through its trustee, Advisory Trust Group LLC

MLI Rx LLC

Burlington Drug Company Inc.

Dakota Drug, Inc.

J M Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company

North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company

Prescription Supply, Inc.

Value Drug Company

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

H.D. Smith, LLC

Valley Wholesale Drug Company, LLC

Defendants

Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC

Sanofi-Aventis Puerto Rico, Inc.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth Pickle

John P. Bjork

Alberto Rodriguez

Greg Shinall

Jessica Rose MacAuley

David P. Germaine

April D. Lambert

Martin Amaro

Kristen Anne Johnson

Joseph M. Vanek

Allison G. Margolies

Clark Craddock

Thomas M. Sobol

John D. Radice

43 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#501

(#501) Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered granting #500 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 5, 2023 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Compel. Responses due by 12/5/2023. (Thomson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

500 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#500

(#500) MOTION for Extension of Time to December 5, 2023 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Compel by ASD Specialty Healthcare, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bergen Brunswig Corporation, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Dakota Drug, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, J M Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company, JM Blanco, MLI Rx LLC, McKesson Corporation, North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company, Oncology Supply, Prescription Supply, Inc., RDC Liquidating Trust, by and through its trustee, Advisory Trust Group LLC, Smith Medical Partners, LLC, The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Valley Wholesale Drug Company, LLC, Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

#499

(#499) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Value Drug Company. (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

#498

(#498) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prescription Supply, Inc.. (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

#497

(#497) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J M Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company. (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

#496

(#496) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dakota Drug, Inc.. (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

#495

(#495) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Burlington Drug Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cobble Hill Holdings, Inc. for Burlington Drug Company Inc... (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

#494

(#494) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company. (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

1 #14

Exhibit L

1 #13

Exhibit K

1 #11

Exhibit I

1 #10

Exhibit H

1 #9

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #2

Civil Category Sheet

780 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#501) Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered granting #500 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 5, 2023 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Compel. Responses due by 12/5/2023. (Thomson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#500) MOTION for Extension of Time to December 5, 2023 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Compel by ASD Specialty Healthcare, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bergen Brunswig Corporation, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Dakota Drug, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, J M Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company, JM Blanco, MLI Rx LLC, McKesson Corporation, North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company, Oncology Supply, Prescription Supply, Inc., RDC Liquidating Trust, by and through its trustee, Advisory Trust Group LLC, Smith Medical Partners, LLC, The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Valley Wholesale Drug Company, LLC, Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#499) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Value Drug Company. (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#498) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prescription Supply, Inc.. (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#497) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J M Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company. (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#496) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dakota Drug, Inc.. (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#495) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Burlington Drug Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cobble Hill Holdings, Inc. for Burlington Drug Company Inc... (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#494) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company. (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#493) NOTICE of Appearance by Susan C. Segura on behalf of Burlington Drug Company Inc., Dakota Drug, Inc., J M Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company, North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company, Prescription Supply, Inc., Value Drug Company (Segura, Susan) (Entered: 11/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#492) MEMORANDUM in Support re #491 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents from Intervenor Plaintiffs filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosanna K. McCalips, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(McCalips, Rosanna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2023: #11 SEALED Memorandum in Support, #12 SEALED Declaration of Rosanna K. McCalips) (Attachment(s) replaced on 11/17/2023: #5 SEALED Exhibit 4, #8 SEALED Exhibit 7, #10 SEALED Exhibit 9) (Thomson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
478 More Docket Entries
03/30/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sanofi, U.S., filed by FWK Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Sobol, Thomas) (Entered: 03/30/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by FWK Holdings LLC.. (Sobol, Thomas) (Entered: 03/30/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Entry of Case Management Order No. 1 by FWK Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 1)(Sobol, Thomas) (Entered: 03/30/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FWK Holdings LLC (Sobol, Thomas) (Entered: 03/30/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E. Diss on behalf of Sanofi, U.S. (Diss, Laura) (Entered: 03/30/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FWK Holdings LLC. (Sobol, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristie A. LaSalle on behalf of FWK Holdings LLC (LaSalle, Kristie) (Entered: 01/10/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Nici, Richard) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2017

Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (adminn, ) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against FWK Holdings LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6435309 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by FWK Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M)(Sobol, Thomas) (Entered: 12/30/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less