This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:39:40 (UTC).

Future Foam Inc et al v. Johnson Controls Inc

Case Summary

On 04/28/2014 Future Foam Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Johnson Controls Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-MC-00026

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Future Foam Inc

Leggett & Platt Inc

Carpenter Co

Carpenter Holdings Inc

E R Carpenter LP

Respondent

Johnson Controls Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Sean P Connolly

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

777 E Wisconsin Ave

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5300

Joseph M Rebein

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

2555 Grand Blvd

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Bethany G Lukitsch

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 E Canal St

Richmond, VA 23219-3916

Howard Feller

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 E Canal St

Richmond, VA 23219-3916

James H Walsh

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 E Canal St

Richmond, VA 23219-3916

Respondent Attorneys

Marc L Newman

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm PC

950 W University Dr - Ste 300

Rochester, MI 48307

Martha J Olijnyk

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm PC

950 W University Dr - Ste 300

Rochester, MI 48307

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Order signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/23/14 transferring case to the District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (cc: all counsel)(nm)

9 #15

Exhibit 14- Unpublished Cases

9 #14

Exhibit 13- MDL Document No. 371

9 #13

Exhibit 12-April 7, 2014 Defendant Email

9 #12

Exhibit 11- February 7, 2014 Defendant Email

9 #11

Exhibit 10- January 29, 2014 JCI Letter

9 #10

Exhibit 9- MDL Document No. 1021

9 #9

Exhibit 8- MDL Document No. 1038

9 #8

Exhibit 7- MDL Document No. 458

9 #7

Exhibit 6- MDL Document No. 420

9 #6

Exhibit 5- Carpenter Website

9 #5

Exhibit 4-JCI Affidavit

9 #4

Exhibit 3- MDL Document No. 1117

9 #2

Exhibit 1- MDL Document No. 46

9 #1

Exhibit List

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Johnson Controls Inc re #1 MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1- MDL Document No. 46, #3 Exhibit 2- MDL Document No. 1115, #4 Exhibit 3- MDL Document No. 1117, #5 Exhibit 4-JCI Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 5- Carpenter Website, #7 Exhibit 6- MDL Document No. 420, #8 Exhibit 7- MDL Document No. 458, #9 Exhibit 8- MDL Document No. 1038, #10 Exhibit 9- MDL Document No. 1021, #11 Exhibit 10- January 29, 2014 JCI Letter, #12 Exhibit 11- February 7, 2014 Defendant Email, #13 Exhibit 12-April 7, 2014 Defendant Email, #14 Exhibit 13- MDL Document No. 371, #15 Exhibit 14- Unpublished Cases)(Newman, Marc)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Connolly, Sean)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketCase Terminated (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/23/14 transferring case to the District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (cc: all counsel)(nm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Johnson Controls Inc re #1 MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1- MDL Document No. 46, #3 Exhibit 2- MDL Document No. 1115, #4 Exhibit 3- MDL Document No. 1117, #5 Exhibit 4-JCI Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 5- Carpenter Website, #7 Exhibit 6- MDL Document No. 420, #8 Exhibit 7- MDL Document No. 458, #9 Exhibit 8- MDL Document No. 1038, #10 Exhibit 9- MDL Document No. 1021, #11 Exhibit 10- January 29, 2014 JCI Letter, #12 Exhibit 11- February 7, 2014 Defendant Email, #13 Exhibit 12-April 7, 2014 Defendant Email, #14 Exhibit 13- MDL Document No. 371, #15 Exhibit 14- Unpublished Cases)(Newman, Marc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/16/14 DENYING Petitioners' request for an expedited briefing schedule and ORDERING that the parties address the amended Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45(f) in their briefs as specified. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc re #1 MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) . (Connolly, Sean)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Johnson Controls Inc re #1 MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) Johnson Controls, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Defendants' Request for Expedited Briefing and Decision. (Newman, Marc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc L Newman on behalf of Johnson Controls Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Marc L. Newman (Newman, Marc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Martha J Olijnyk on behalf of Johnson Controls Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Martha J. Olijnyk (Olijnyk, Martha)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #3 Statement filed by E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., Leggett & Platt Inc, Carpenter Co., Future Foam Inc ; All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc Statement Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 37. (Connolly, Sean)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) BRIEF in Support filed by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc re #1 MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Connolly, Sean)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Connolly, Sean)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenter Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where E.R. CARPENTER COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FUTURE FOAM, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Leggett & Platt, Incorporated is a litigant