This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:39:28 (UTC).

Future Foam Inc et al v. Johnson Controls Inc

Case Summary

On 05/23/2014 Future Foam Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Johnson Controls Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-MC-00034

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Future Foam Inc

Leggett & Platt Inc.

Carpenter Co.

Carpenter Holdings, Inc.

E.R. Carpenter, L.P.

Respondent

Johnson Controls, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Meghan M. Blinn

Attorney at Kutak Rock - Omaha

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Sean P. Connolly

Attorney at Kutak Rock - Omaha

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Joseph M. Rebein

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon - Kansas City

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

Bethany G. Lukitsch

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Howard Feller

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

James H. Walsh

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Respondent Attorneys

Adam T. Schnatz

Attorney at Miller Law - Rochester

950 West University Drive

Rochester, MI 48307

Marc L. Newman

Attorney at Miller Law - Rochester

950 West University Drive

Rochester, MI 48307

Martha J. Olijnyk

Attorney at Miller Law - Rochester

950 West University Drive

Rochester, MI 48307

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Order re: July 31 conference. Non-party Johnson Controls Inc's Motion for reconsideration is denied in part as to the Motion's request that the Woodbridge defendants be barred from accessing any portion of the subpoena production, and denied in part without prejudice as to the Motion's FRCP 45(d)(2)(B)(ii) cost-shifting request. Further order that JCI will meet and confer with certain defendants to discuss its Rule 45 cost-shifting request. If JCI and certain defendants cannot resolve this matter on their own, they will contact Chambers as instructed during the conference. Related Doc #14 . Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/5/14.(S,J) (Entered: 08/05/2014)

#17

(#17) Opposition to #14 Motion for reconsideration and/or to amend the 6/17/2014 Order filed by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc.. (Blinn, Meghan) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#16

(#16) Agenda for July 31 Record Conference This Court will hold a record Status Phone Conference (Court Reporter: Angela Nixon) on Thursday, July 31, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. (EDT), to discuss Non-party Johnson Control, Inc.s #14 Motion for Reconsideration. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/24/2014. (S,R) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#15

(#15) Proposed Order filed by Johnson Controls, Inc. Related document(s) #14 . (Newman, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2014)

14 #1

Exhibit A- Department of Justice Press Release June 27, 2014

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) Order RE: Motion to Compel Subpoena Compliance. Certain Defendants Motion to Compel Johnson Control, Inc.s (JCI) Compliance with Subpoena (Doc. #1 ), as modified by the parties negotiations subsequent to issuance of the Subpoena, is granted. See Doc. #12 -1. JCI shall comply with the Subpoena by a date mutually agreed to by the parties. Parties shall continue to cooperate in good faith on discovery matters, and should make reasonable efforts to accommodate legitimate discovery-related concerns. Case is dismissed. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/16/2014.(S,R) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

2 #18

Exhibit R

2 #17

Exhibit Q

2 #16

Exhibit P

2 #15

Exhibit O

2 #13

Exhibit M

2 #9

Exhibit I

2 #8

Exhibit H

2 #4

Exhibit D

2 #2

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit Proposed Order

1 #1

Main Document

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order re: July 31 conference. Non-party Johnson Controls Inc's Motion for reconsideration is denied in part as to the Motion's request that the Woodbridge defendants be barred from accessing any portion of the subpoena production, and denied in part without prejudice as to the Motion's FRCP 45(d)(2)(B)(ii) cost-shifting request. Further order that JCI will meet and confer with certain defendants to discuss its Rule 45 cost-shifting request. If JCI and certain defendants cannot resolve this matter on their own, they will contact Chambers as instructed during the conference. Related Doc #14 . Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/5/14.(S,J) (Entered: 08/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Opposition to #14 Motion for reconsideration and/or to amend the 6/17/2014 Order filed by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc.. (Blinn, Meghan) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Agenda for July 31 Record Conference This Court will hold a record Status Phone Conference (Court Reporter: Angela Nixon) on Thursday, July 31, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. (EDT), to discuss Non-party Johnson Control, Inc.s #14 Motion for Reconsideration. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/24/2014. (S,R) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Proposed Order filed by Johnson Controls, Inc. Related document(s) #14 . (Newman, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Motion for reconsideration and/or to amend the 6/17/2014 Order filed by Respondent Johnson Controls, Inc. Related document(s) #13 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Department of Justice Press Release June 27, 2014)(Newman, Marc) Modified on 7/21/2014 (M,L). (Entered: 07/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order RE: Motion to Compel Subpoena Compliance. Certain Defendants Motion to Compel Johnson Control, Inc.s (JCI) Compliance with Subpoena (Doc. #1 ), as modified by the parties negotiations subsequent to issuance of the Subpoena, is granted. See Doc. #12 -1. JCI shall comply with the Subpoena by a date mutually agreed to by the parties. Parties shall continue to cooperate in good faith on discovery matters, and should make reasonable efforts to accommodate legitimate discovery-related concerns. Case is dismissed. Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/16/2014.(S,R) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Reply in support of #1 Motion to compel compliance with subpoena and renewed request for expedited decision filed by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blinn, Meghan) Modified on 6/17/2014 (S,R). (Entered: 06/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketJudge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. Case related to MDL 2196 (S,HR) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Eastern. Case number 2:14-mc-00026. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/23/14 transferring case to the District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (cc: all counsel)(nm) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/16/14 DENYING Petitioners' request for an expedited briefing schedule and ORDERING that the parties address the amended Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45(f) in their briefs as specified. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nm) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc re #1 MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) . (Connolly, Sean) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Johnson Controls Inc re #1 MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) Johnson Controls, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Defendants' Request for Expedited Briefing and Decision. (Newman, Marc) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc L Newman on behalf of Johnson Controls Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Marc L. Newman (Newman, Marc) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Martha J Olijnyk on behalf of Johnson Controls Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Martha J. Olijnyk (Olijnyk, Martha) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller (jcl) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 04/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #3 Statement filed by E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., Leggett & Platt Inc, Carpenter Co., Future Foam Inc ; All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc Statement Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 37. (Connolly, Sean) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) BRIEF in Support filed by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc re #1 MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Connolly, Sean) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Enforce Subpoena against Johnson Controls, Inc. by Carpenter Co., Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Future Foam, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Filing Fee PAID $46 receipt number 0757-1880155) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Connolly, Sean) [Transferred from wied on 5/23/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenter Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where E.R. CARPENTER COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FUTURE FOAM, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Leggett & Platt, Incorporated is a litigant