This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2019 at 07:59:27 (UTC).

Funrise Toys, Ltd. v. Hasbro, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 Funrise Toys, Ltd filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hasbro, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00656

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Funrise Toys, Ltd.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Hasbro, Inc.

Hasbro International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Paul M. Kessimian

Attorney at Partridge, Snow & Hahn LLP

40 Westminster Street, Suite 1100

Providence, RI 02903

Marvin Gelfand

Attorney at Weintraub Tobin Law Corporation

10250 Constellation Blvd., #2900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven E. Snow

Attorney at Partridge, Snow & Hahn LLP

40 Westminster Street, Suite 1100

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Joshua C. Krumholz

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

10 St. James Avenue, 11Th Floor

Boston, MA 02116

Courtney L Batliner

10 St. James Avenue, 11Th Floor

Boston, MA 02116

Patricia K. Rocha

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.

One Citizens Plaza, 8Th Floor, 274-7200, Fax: 351-4607

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

14 #4

Exhibit 4

14 #3

Exhibit 3

14 #2

Exhibit 2

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Hasbro International, Inc., Hasbro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rocha, Patricia) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hasbro International, Inc., Hasbro, Inc.. (Rocha, Patricia) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Courtney L. Batliner to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1304518 ) filed by Hasbro International, Inc., Hasbro, Inc.. (Rocha, Patricia) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#8

HEARING CANCELLED re #8 Settlement Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan has been cancelled. Court to reschedule.(Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Hasbro International, Inc., Hasbro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1295653 ), filed by Funrise Toys, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Kessimian, Paul) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Hasbro International, Inc., Hasbro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rocha, Patricia) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING CANCELLED re #8 Settlement Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan has been cancelled. Court to reschedule.(Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 1/3/2019 with Attorneys Marvin Gelfand, Steven Snow, Patricia Rocha and Joshua Krumholz. (Chambers at 4:30.) (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hasbro International, Inc., Hasbro, Inc.. (Rocha, Patricia) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Courtney L Batliner. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/21/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua C. Krumholz. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/21/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Courtney L. Batliner to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1304518 ) filed by Hasbro International, Inc., Hasbro, Inc.. (Rocha, Patricia) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Joshua C. Krumholz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1304507 ) filed by Hasbro International, Inc., Hasbro, Inc.. (Rocha, Patricia) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. Rocha on behalf of Hasbro International, Inc., Hasbro, Inc. (Rocha, Patricia) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Funrise Toys, Ltd.. Hasbro International, Inc. waiver sent on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (Kessimian, Paul) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Funrise Toys, Ltd.. Hasbro, Inc. waiver sent on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (Kessimian, Paul) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marvin Gelfand. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/18/2018. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Marvin Gelfand to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1302614 ) filed by Funrise Toys, Ltd.. (Kessimian, Paul) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Funrise Toys, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Matrix Holdings Limited for Funrise Toys, Ltd... (Kessimian, Paul) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Hasbro International, Inc., Hasbro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1295653 ), filed by Funrise Toys, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Kessimian, Paul) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1295653 ), filed by Funrise Toys, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Kessimian, Paul) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less