This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2018 at 07:51:23 (UTC).

Funk v. Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 Funk filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David A. Ezra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00737

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David A. Ezra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mandi M. Funk

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Tolteca Enterprises, Inc.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marwan Rocco Daher

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorneys

Kendall W. Carter

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Thomas A. Clarke

Attorney at Attorney at Law

8026 Vantage Drive, Suite 105

San Antonio, TX 78230

Tyson Mark Lies

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 North Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75056

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Lies, Tyson) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Lies, Tyson) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tolteca Enterprises, Inc..(Clarke, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#11

(#11) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lies, Tyson) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#9

(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Carter, Kendall) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Kendall W. Carter added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Carter, Kendall) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mandi M. Funk. Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mandi M. Funk. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 07/29/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mandi M. Funk. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 07/29/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Tolteca Enterprises, Inc.. (wg) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marwan Rocco Daher on behalf of Mandi M. Funk (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A-Release of Judgement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11020224), filed by Mandi M. Funk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Release of Judgement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Lies, Tyson) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Lies, Tyson) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tolteca Enterprises, Inc..(Clarke, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Reset Deadlines: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 9/12/2018. (wg) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Responsive pleading due on or before Sept. 12, 2018. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lies, Tyson) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Carter, Kendall) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Kendall W. Carter added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Carter, Kendall) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mandi M. Funk. Tolteca Enterprises, Inc. served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mandi M. Funk. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 07/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mandi M. Funk. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 07/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Tolteca Enterprises, Inc.. (wg) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marwan Rocco Daher on behalf of Mandi M. Funk (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mandi M. Funk. (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11020224), filed by Mandi M. Funk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Release of Judgement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.