This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2018 at 07:47:07 (UTC).

Fulps et al v. American National Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Fulps filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American National Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven P. Shreder and Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00222

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Steven P. Shreder

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lafe Fulps

Landyn Fulps

JD Fulps

Logan Fulps

Defendant

American National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M. Thetford

Attorney at Levinson Smith & Huffman, PC

1743 E 71St St

Tulsa, OK 74136-5108

Defendant Attorney

Seth A. Day

Attorney at Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (OKC)

100 N Broadway, Ste 2900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8865

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2018; Joinder of Parties due by 9/7/2018; Exhibit List due by 1/2/2019; Witness List due by 1/2/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2019; Discovery due by 2/8/2019; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 3/14/2019; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White; Jury Trial set for 4/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#15

(#15) Amended JOINT STATUS REPORT by JD Fulps, Lafe Fulps, Landyn Fulps, Logan Fulps (Thetford, John) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#14

(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT by JD Fulps, Lafe Fulps, Landyn Fulps, Logan Fulps (Thetford, John) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#13

(#13) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#12

(#12) Amended DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by JD Fulps, Lafe Fulps, Landyn Fulps, Logan Fulps (Thetford, John) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by JD Fulps, Lafe Fulps, Landyn Fulps, Logan Fulps (Thetford, John) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 8/24/2018 (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit File-Stamped Notice

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by American National Insurance Company (With attachments)(Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Seth A. Day on behalf of American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/23/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Wagoner County District Court, case number 18-CJ-212 by American National Insurance Company (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2018; Joinder of Parties due by 9/7/2018; Exhibit List due by 1/2/2019; Witness List due by 1/2/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2019; Discovery due by 2/8/2019; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 3/14/2019; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White; Jury Trial set for 4/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Amended JOINT STATUS REPORT by JD Fulps, Lafe Fulps, Landyn Fulps, Logan Fulps (Thetford, John) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT by JD Fulps, Lafe Fulps, Landyn Fulps, Logan Fulps (Thetford, John) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Amended DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by JD Fulps, Lafe Fulps, Landyn Fulps, Logan Fulps (Thetford, John) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by JD Fulps, Lafe Fulps, Landyn Fulps, Logan Fulps (Thetford, John) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 8/24/2018 (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by American National Insurance Company (With attachments)(Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White, Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-222-RAW (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Seth A. Day on behalf of American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/16/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1191956 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by American National Insurance Company (Day, Seth) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/23/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Wagoner County District Court, case number 18-CJ-212 by American National Insurance Company (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by American National Insurance Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • PETITION filed in State Court against American National Insurance Company by Landyn Fulps, Lafe Fulps, JD Fulps (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less