Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2019 at 08:06:38 (UTC).

Fuller v. Washington et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Fuller filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Washington. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony P. Patti and Robert H. Cleland. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-13884

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

Presiding Judge

Robert H. Cleland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Curtis Fuller

Carson City, MI 48811

Defendants

B. Pierce

John W. Prelesnik

W. Smith

R. Zamarron

J. Stoddard

J. Bussell

J. Karberl

R. Rewerts

M. J. Dollar

D. Stephens

Paul Klee

G. King

Michael Sun

Lewis

Mark Pokley

Robert Napel

R. Frias

Carmen Palmer

Purchase

2 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Curtis Fuller. (NAhm) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#6

(#6) JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff Curtis Fuller (LWag) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER SUMMARILY DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND any appeal taken by Plaintiff would not be done in good faith Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Mediation Program (DAll) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

2 #1

Document Continuation

#2

(#2) APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Curtis Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DAll) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Curtis Fuller against J. Bussell, M. J. Dollar, R. Frias, J. Karberl, G. King, Paul Klee, Lewis, Robert Napel, Carmen Palmer, B. Pierce, Mark Pokley, John W. Prelesnik, Purchase, R. Rewerts, W. Smith, D. Stephens, J. Stoddard, Michael Sun, Heidi Washington, R. Zamarron (DAll) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Curtis Fuller. (NAhm) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Judgment, #5 Order Dismissing Case on Curtis Fuller Pris. No. 211080 at Carson City Correctional Facility, 10274 Boyer Road, Carson City, MI 48811. (LWag) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff Curtis Fuller (LWag) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER SUMMARILY DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND any appeal taken by Plaintiff would not be done in good faith Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Mediation Program (DAll) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Curtis Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DAll) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Curtis Fuller against J. Bussell, M. J. Dollar, R. Frias, J. Karberl, G. King, Paul Klee, Lewis, Robert Napel, Carmen Palmer, B. Pierce, Mark Pokley, John W. Prelesnik, Purchase, R. Rewerts, W. Smith, D. Stephens, J. Stoddard, Michael Sun, Heidi Washington, R. Zamarron (DAll) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lewis is a litigant