This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 07:44:44 (UTC).

Fuller v. Durrani et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Fuller filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Durrani. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael R. Barrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00804

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Barrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy N Fuller

Defendants

MD Abubakar Atiq Durrani

Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc.

Christ Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin M. Maraan, II

Attorney at Benjamin M. Maraan II

44Th Floor Carew Tower, 441 Vine Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Robert Albert Winter, Jr.

P.O. Box 175883

Fort Mitchell, KY 41017-5883

Defendant Attorneys

James Foley Brockman

Attorney at Lindhorst & Dreidame

312 Walnut Street, Suite 3100

Cincinnati, OH 45202-4048

Michael Francis Lyon

Attorney at Lindhorst & Dreidame

312 Walnut Stret, Suite 2300

Cincinnati, OH 45202-4091

Jennifer Orr Mitchell

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl - 1

1900 Chemed Center, 255 E 5Th Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Matthew Stephen Arend

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl

1900 Chemed Center, 255 E. 5Th Street, Suite 1900

Cincinnati, OH 45202

R. Samuel Gilley

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl

255 E. Fifth Street, Suite 1917

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Jeremie W Imbus

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP

225 East Fifth Street, Suite 1900

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings; Responses due in 90 days. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/16/19. (ba) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#21

(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Amy N Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Maraan, Benjamin) Modified Docket Text on 1/14/2019 (bjc). (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc., Abubakar Atiq Durrani. (Brockman, James) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 1/31/2019. by Plaintiff Amy N Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

12 #3

Exhibit C

12 #2

Exhibit B

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 1/31/2019. by Plaintiff Amy N Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc. Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (bjc) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Abubakar Atiq Durrani served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (eh) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#3

(#3) Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 COMPLAINT and #2 Summons Issued. (eh) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#2

(#3) Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 COMPLAINT and #2 Summons Issued. (eh) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

1 #4

Summons Form

1 #3

Summons Form

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc., Abubakar Atiq Durrani. (Brockman, James) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings; Responses due in 90 days. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/16/19. (ba) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; Responses due by 1/31/2019. Replies due by 2/14/2019. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/11/19. (ba) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Amy N Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Maraan, Benjamin) Modified Docket Text on 1/14/2019 (bjc). (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc., Abubakar Atiq Durrani. (Brockman, James) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/29/2019. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 1/31/2019. by Plaintiff Amy N Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Francis Lyon for Defendants Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc., Abubakar Atiq Durrani (Lyon, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by James Foley Brockman for Defendants Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc., Abubakar Atiq Durrani (Brockman, James) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE by Defendants Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc., Abubakar Atiq Durrani Notice of Demand for Dismissal and Intent to File a Good Faith Motion on Behalf of Durrani CAST (Brockman, James) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc., Abubakar Atiq Durrani. (Brockman, James) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Orr Mitchell for Defendant Christ Hospital (Mitchell, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Christ Hospital. Christ Hospital served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (eh) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc. answer due 1/9/2019; Abubakar Atiq Durrani answer due 1/9/2019. (jlw) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION Stipulation Granting Extension of Time within Which to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Defend by Defendants Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc., Abubakar Atiq Durrani. (Brockman, James) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc. Center for Advanced Spine Technologies, Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (bjc) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Abubakar Atiq Durrani served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (eh) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 COMPLAINT and #2 Summons Issued. (eh) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eh) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • If this case is referred, it will be to Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6685795), filed by Amy N Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form) (Maraan, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less