This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2018 at 07:27:15 (UTC).

Fuller et al v. Carollo et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 Fuller filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Carollo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-24190

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Martin A. Pinilla, II

William O. Fuller

Defendants

John Does 1-10

Joe Carollo

Intervenor

Viernes Culturales/Cultural Fridays Inc.

1637 Sw 8Th St.

Miami, FL 33135

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey W. Gutchess

Attorney at AXS Law Group

1850 Purdy Avenue

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Brandon Perry Rose

Attorney at AXS Law Group, PLLC

2121 Nw 2Nd Avenue, Suite 201

Wynwood, FL 33127

Defendant Attorneys

Benedict P. Kuehne

Attorney at Kuehne Davis Law, P.A.

Miami Tower, Suite 3550, 100 Se 2Nd Street

Miami, FL 33131-2154

Thomas E. Scott, Jr.

Attorney at Cole Scott & Kissane

Dadeland Centre Ii Suite 1400, 9150 S Dadeland Boulevard

Miami, FL 33156

Intervenor Attorney

Alejandro Brito

Attorney at Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.

100 Se 2Nd Street, 27Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Martin A. Pinilla, II, William O. Fuller (Rose, Brandon) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#35

(#35) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#34

(#34) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#33

(#33) ORDER granting #28 Viernes Culturales/Cultural Fridays, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene and Denying as moot #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/28/2018. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#29

(#29) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/November 27, 2018/3:00 P.M. . Attorney/Representative: Robert Zarco, Esq. by Viernes Culturales/Cultural Fridays Inc.. Responses due by 12/11/2018 (Brito, Alejandro) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

28 #1

Certification

#28

(#28) EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency attached by Viernes Culturales/Cultural Fridays Inc.. Responses due by 12/11/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Brito, Alejandro) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

25 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order on Oversize Response

#25

(#34) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cetification of Expedited Hearing)(Gutchess, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#5

(#36) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Martin A. Pinilla, II, William O. Fuller (Rose, Brandon) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

4 #2

Exhibit B - Proposed Summons

4 #1

Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, #1 Complaint, Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Summons) (Gutchess, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Sierra March 8 Email

1 #2

Exhibit B - Miro Statement

1 #1

Exhibit A - Ethics Report

#1

(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II. Joe Carollo served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Gutchess, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2018)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Martin A. Pinilla, II, William O. Fuller (Rose, Brandon) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Set Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/8/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. (mmd) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER granting #28 Viernes Culturales/Cultural Fridays, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene and Denying as moot #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/28/2018. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Federico A. Moreno: Motion Hearing held on 11/27/2018 re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Martin A. Pinilla, II, William O. Fuller. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sc) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Scott, Jr on behalf of Joe Carollo. Attorney Thomas E. Scott, Jr added to party Joe Carollo(pty:dft). (Scott, Thomas) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rose, Brandon) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/November 27, 2018/3:00 P.M. . Attorney/Representative: Robert Zarco, Esq. by Viernes Culturales/Cultural Fridays Inc.. Responses due by 12/11/2018 (Brito, Alejandro) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency attached by Viernes Culturales/Cultural Fridays Inc.. Responses due by 12/11/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Brito, Alejandro) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 18-22509-CIV-MORENO (mmd) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (jc). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey W. Gutchess on behalf of William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II (Gutchess, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II. Joe Carollo served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Gutchess, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Joe Carollo. (lk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cetification of Expedited Hearing)(Gutchess, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II. (Gutchess, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, #1 Complaint, Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Summons) (Gutchess, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • (#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (lk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Joe Carollo, John Does 1-10. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11065413, filed by William O. Fuller, Martin A. Pinilla, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ethics Report, #2 Exhibit B - Miro Statement, #3 Exhibit C - Sierra March 8 Email)(Gutchess, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alejandro Brito