This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2018 at 07:52:53 (UTC).

Frye v. Stephens et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 Frye filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Stephens. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00205

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Devon A. Frye

Pikeville, TN 37367

Defendants

Robert Smith

Tiffany Collins

Keith Dawkins

Terry Glenn

Douglas Stephens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Laura H Cahill

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Virginia

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Good Standing

13 #2

Cover Letter

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura H. Cahill (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016102) by Tiffany Collins. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing, #2 Cover Letter)(BDG, ) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

7 #1

Cover Letter

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope Back)(BDG, )Service packet hand-delivered to USMS. (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#12

(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Summons Issued. (BDG, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

7 #3

Envelope Back

7 #2

Envelope

10 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #10 Summons Reissued re Tiffany Collins, Keith Dawkins, Terry Glenn. (BDG, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#10

(#10) Summons Reissued as to Tiffany Collins, Keith Dawkins, Terry Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG, )Service packet hand-delivered to USMS. (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#9

(#9) Declaration by Devon A. Frye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope Back)(BDG, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

9 #3

Envelope Back

9 #2

Envelope

9 #1

Propsed Order

#8

(#8) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (BDG, )Notice mailed to Frye. (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Devon A. Frye. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope)(BDG, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

3 #1

Envelope

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11-2-18. (KMG, ) Modified on 11/2/2018 (BDG, ). Order mailed to Laura H Cahill. (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Tiffany Collins as to Tiffany Collins. (BDG, ) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura H. Cahill (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016102) by Tiffany Collins. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing, #2 Cover Letter)(BDG, ) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Summons Issued. (BDG, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #10 Summons Reissued re Tiffany Collins, Keith Dawkins, Terry Glenn. (BDG, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Reissued as to Tiffany Collins, Keith Dawkins, Terry Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG, )Service packet hand-delivered to USMS. (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Declaration by Devon A. Frye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope Back)(BDG, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (BDG, )Notice mailed to Frye. (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Unable to serve summons packet to P.O boxes per Marshals. Packet received back for Defendants Collins, Dawkins, and Glenn. Packets mailed back to Frye with instruction to fill out properly with physical mailing address. (BDG, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope Back)(BDG, )Service packet hand-delivered to USMS. (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Service packets (a blank summons and USM 285 form) for all Defendants mailed to Plaintiff Frye. (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/21/2018. (BDG, ) Order sent to the Warden of the BCCX, the Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Correction (TDOC),the Attorney General for the State of Tennessee, the Courts financial deputy, and Frye. (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • (#5) ORDER RELATING CASES. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to case no. 1:16-cv-34. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(1). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Travis R. McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger, this case will also be assigned to those same judges. However, consolidation is not ordered. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9/5/18. (Steger, Christopher) (Steger, Christopher) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Devon A. Frye. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope Back)(BDG, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Devon A. Frye. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope Back)(BDG, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Devon A. Frye. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope)(BDG, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Devon A. Frye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope Back)(BDG, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.