This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2018 at 07:10:44 (UTC).

Fry v. Ascension Health Ministry Services

Case Summary

On 10/08/2018 Fry filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Ascension Health Ministry Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01573

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Fry

Defendants

Ascension Health Ministry Services d/b/a Columbia St. Mary's

Ascension Health Ministry Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathaniel Cade, Jr

Attorney at Cade Law Group LLC

Po Box 170887

Milwaukee, WI 53217

Defendant Attorneys

Casey M Kaiser

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

111 E Kilbourn Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Sofija Anderson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

111 E Kilbourn Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 11:00 AM 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties are to file their Rule 26(f)Report no later than 12/27/2018. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 877-336-1839 and use access code 5188910# to join the call (cc: all counsel)(asc) Modified on 11/27/2018 (asc). (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/27/2018) (asc).

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Ascension Health Ministry Services.(Kaiser, Casey)

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) LETTER from Nathaniel Cade, Jr. with regards to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as being moot. (Cade, Nathaniel)

12 #2

Exhibit B

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ascension Health Ministry Services filed by William Fry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cade, Nathaniel)

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE Statement by Ascension Health Ministry Services. (Kaiser, Casey)

#8

TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 11/13/2018 finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss. See Aqua Finance, Inc. v. Harvest King, Inc., No. 07-C-15, 2007 WL 5404939, *1 (W.D. Wis. Mar. 12, 2007) ("Under normal circumstances, the filing of an amended complaint renders moot any pending motion to dismiss."). (cc: all counsel) (llc)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sofija Anderson on behalf of Ascension Health Ministry Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Sofija Anderson (Anderson, Sofija)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Fry. William Fry served on 10/11/2018. (Cade, Nathaniel)

#4

(#4) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by William Fry (Cade, Nathaniel)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by William Fry (Cade, Nathaniel)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Ascension Health Ministry Services d/b/a Columbia St. Mary's by William Fry. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2938359) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cade, Nathaniel)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 11:00 AM in By Telephone before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 11:00 AM 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties are to file their Rule 26(f)Report no later than 12/27/2018. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 877-336-1839 and use access code 5188910# to join the call (cc: all counsel)(asc) Modified on 11/27/2018 (asc). (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/27/2018) (asc).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Ascension Health Ministry Services.(Kaiser, Casey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ascension Health Ministry Services. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kaiser, Casey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 11/13/2018 finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss. See Aqua Finance, Inc. v. Harvest King, Inc., No. 07-C-15, 2007 WL 5404939, *1 (W.D. Wis. Mar. 12, 2007) ("Under normal circumstances, the filing of an amended complaint renders moot any pending motion to dismiss."). (cc: all counsel) (llc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) LETTER from Nathaniel Cade, Jr. with regards to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as being moot. (Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ascension Health Ministry Services filed by William Fry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURE Statement by Ascension Health Ministry Services. (Kaiser, Casey)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Casey M Kaiser on behalf of Ascension Health Ministry Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Casey M. Kaiser (Kaiser, Casey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sofija Anderson on behalf of Ascension Health Ministry Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Sofija Anderson (Anderson, Sofija)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Fry. William Fry served on 10/11/2018. (Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Ascension Health Ministry Services. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by William Fry (Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by William Fry. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by William Fry (Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Ascension Health Ministry Services d/b/a Columbia St. Mary's by William Fry. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2938359) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.