This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 07:54:30 (UTC).

Fritts et al v. Simerly et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Fritts filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Simerly. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J Ronnie Greer and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00142

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Ronnie Greer

Referral Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garry Fritts

Cynthia Fritts

Defendants

Carter County, Tennessee

Jonathan Simerly

Michael Malone

Carter County Sheriff's Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ursula Bailey

Attorney at Law Office of Ursula Bailey

422 South Gay Street, Suite 301

Knoxville, TN 37902

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey M Ward

Attorney at Milligan & Coleman

P O Box 1060, 230 West Depot Street

Greeneville, TN 37744-1060

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's (s') counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/19/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

9 #1

Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3752424.), filed by Garry Fritts, Cynthia Fritts. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sheriff's Dept., #3 Summons Malone, #4 Summons Carter County, #5 Summons Simerly)(Bailey, Ursula) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

1 #5

Summons Simerly

1 #4

Summons Carter County

1 #3

Summons Malone

1 #2

Summons Sheriff's Dept.

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Carter County Sheriff's Department, Carter County, Tennessee, Michael Malone, Jonathan Simerly.(Ward, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to file responsive pleading by Carter County Sheriff's Department, Carter County, Tennessee, Michael Malone, Jonathan Simerly. (Ward, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Garry Fritts, Cynthia Fritts. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Simerly, #2 Summons Carter County Sheriff's dept., #3 Summons Malone)(Bailey, Ursula) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

6 #2

Summons Carter County Sheriff's dept.

6 #1

Summons Simerly

6 #3

Summons Malone

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on August 24, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on August 24, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on August 24, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's (s') counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/19/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Carter County Sheriff's Department, Carter County, Tennessee, Michael Malone, Jonathan Simerly.(Ward, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to file responsive pleading by Carter County Sheriff's Department, Carter County, Tennessee, Michael Malone, Jonathan Simerly. (Ward, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Garry Fritts, Cynthia Fritts. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Simerly, #2 Summons Carter County Sheriff's dept., #3 Summons Malone)(Bailey, Ursula) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on August 24, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on August 24, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on August 24, 2018. (RLK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to all Defendants. (RLK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (RLK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3752424.), filed by Garry Fritts, Cynthia Fritts. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sheriff's Dept., #3 Summons Malone, #4 Summons Carter County, #5 Summons Simerly)(Bailey, Ursula) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.