This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2018 at 07:37:13 (UTC).

Friese, Ryan v. State Collection Service, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 Friese, Ryan filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against State Collection Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00663

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Friese

Defendants

Equifax, Inc.

State Collection Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas E. Fairweather

Attorney at Hawks Quindel, S.C.

409 East Main Street, Po Box 2155

Madison, WI 53701-2155

Nathan Edward DeLadurantey

Attorney at DeLadurantey Law Office, LLC

330 S. Executive Drive, Suite 109

Brookfield, WI 53005

Michael Godbe

Attorney at Hawks Quindel, S.C.

409 East Main Street, Po Box 2155

Madison, WI 53701-2155

Defendant Attorneys

Kendall William Carter

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree St. Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Patrick Daniel Newman

Attorney at Bassford Remele P.A.

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. State Collection Service, Inc. served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Godbe, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2297244.), filed by Ryan Friese, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - State Collection Service, #3 Summons - Equifax, Inc.) (Godbe, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Equifax, Inc. (Carter, Kendall) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER by Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Equifax, Inc. served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Godbe, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Equifax, Inc. and State Collection Service, Inc. (jls) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Daniel Newman for Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER by Defendant Equifax, Inc. (Carter, Kendall) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

1 #2

Summons State Collection Service

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#10

(#10) Notice of Settlement as to Equifax, Inc. Only by Plaintiff Ryan Friese. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

1 #3

Summons Equifax, Inc.

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Settlement as to Equifax, Inc. Only by Plaintiff Ryan Friese. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2018 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER by Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Daniel Newman for Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. (Newman, Patrick) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Equifax, Inc. (Carter, Kendall) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER by Defendant Equifax, Inc. (Carter, Kendall) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Equifax, Inc. served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Godbe, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. State Collection Service, Inc. served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Godbe, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Equifax, Inc. and State Collection Service, Inc. (jls) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2297244.), filed by Ryan Friese, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - State Collection Service, #3 Summons - Equifax, Inc.) (Godbe, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.