This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:22:18 (UTC).

FRIENDS OF ANIMALS v. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 FRIENDS OF ANIMALS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01761

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRIENDS OF ANIMALS

Defendants

UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE

RYAN ZINKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremy Devin McKay

Attorney at ENVIRONMENTAL AND ANIMAL DEFENSE

3773 E Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 575

Denver, CO 80209

Alexa Marie Carreno

Attorney at ENVIRONMENTAL AND ANIMAL DEFENSE

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Ste 575

Denver, CO 80209

 

Court Documents

1 #8

Summons

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General August 6, 2018. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5608885) filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

1 #6

Summons

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RYAN ZINKE served on 8/3/2018 (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

4 #1

Notice and Consent

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/5/2018. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Marie Carreno on behalf of FRIENDS OF ANIMALS (Carreno, Alexa) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #7

Summons

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #9

Summons

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 8/3/2018 (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RYAN ZINKE served on 8/3/2018 (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/5/2018. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General August 6, 2018. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsth) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Marie Carreno on behalf of FRIENDS OF ANIMALS (Carreno, Alexa) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5608885) filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less