This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2019 at 07:41:07 (UTC).

Frenkel v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Frenkel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-25014

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shir Frenkel

Plantation, FL 33324

Igal Tyszman

Evan R. Krakower

Defendant

Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.

1050 Caribbean Way

Miami, FL 33132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Debie Chalik

Attorney at Chalik & Chalik PA

10063 Nw 1St Court

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorneys

Darren Wayne Friedman

Attorney at Foreman Friedman, PA

2 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2300, One Biscayne Tower

Miami, FL 33131

Jonathan Hernandez

Attorney at Foreman Freidman, PA

2 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

12 #3

Exhibit exhibit C - Order

12 #2

Exhibit exhibit B- Motion to Dismiss

12 #1

Exhibit exhibit A - Complaint

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shir Frenkel. Replies due by 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit exhibit B- Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit exhibit C - Order)(Chalik, Debie) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (Friedman, Darren) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

10 #3

Exhibit Tour Operator Agreement

10 #2

Exhibit Guest Ticket Contract

10 #1

Exhibit Shore Excursion Terms

#10

(#10) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. Responses due by 2/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shore Excursion Terms, #2 Exhibit Guest Ticket Contract, #3 Exhibit Tour Operator Agreement)(Hernandez, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darren Wayne Friedman on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. Attorney Darren Wayne Friedman added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.(pty:dft). (Friedman, Darren) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. Attorney Jonathan Hernandez added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#6

(#6) Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Igal Tyszman and Evan R. Krakower. (Chalik, Debie) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and Notice of Court Practice and Procedures Signed by Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz for Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/4/2018. See attached document for full details. (ra) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11202510, filed by Shir Frenkel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit)(Chalik, Debie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shir Frenkel. Replies due by 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit exhibit B- Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit exhibit C - Order)(Chalik, Debie) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. (Friedman, Darren) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. Responses due by 2/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shore Excursion Terms, #2 Exhibit Guest Ticket Contract, #3 Exhibit Tour Operator Agreement)(Hernandez, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darren Wayne Friedman on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. Attorney Darren Wayne Friedman added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.(pty:dft). (Friedman, Darren) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, Defendant shall have until January 19, 2019 to file its Answer/Response to the Complaint. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/2/2019. (abu) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. Attorney Jonathan Hernandez added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Igal Tyszman and Evan R. Krakower. (Chalik, Debie) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and Notice of Court Practice and Procedures Signed by Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz for Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/4/2018. See attached document for full details. (ra) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. (dj) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • (#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case.Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (dj) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (dj) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11202510, filed by Shir Frenkel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit)(Chalik, Debie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD., A foreign corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Hernandez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darren Wayne Friedman