This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2018 at 07:57:22 (UTC).

French et al v. A.W. Chesterton Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2016 French filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W Chesterton Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C. Nugent. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-01777

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C. Nugent

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Zurn Industries, Inc.

General Refractories Company

Uniroyal, Inc.

ArvinMeritor, Inc.

Ohio Valley Insulating Company, Inc.

Ajax Magnethermic Corp.

Osram Sylvania, Inc.

North American Manufacturing Company

General Electric Corporation

Wheeler Protective Apparel Corp.

Robertson-Ceco Corp.

Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Honeywell International, Inc.

Edward R. Hart Company

Macomb Group, Inc.

Fairmont Supply Company

Mobil Oil Corporation

Tasco Insulations, Inc

Ferro Engineering Division of ON Marine Services Company

Insul Company, Inc.

127 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Douglas R. Simek(Designation Retained)

Angela M. Hayden(Designation Retained)

Diane L. Feigi(Designation Retained)

John A. Valenti(Designation Retained)

Steven G. Blackmer(Designation Retained)

Melanie M. Irwin(Designation Retained)

Elizabeth N. Davis(Designation Retained)

Perry W. Doran, II(Designation Retained)

Other Attorneys

Matthew J. Doz(Designation Retained)

John P. Patterson(Designation Retained)

Andrew M. Wargo(Designation Retained)

Nicholas L. Evanchan, Jr.(Designation Retained)

Stephen M. Fowler(Designation Retained)

James L. Ferraro(Designation Retained)

Christopher C. Ross(Designation Retained)

John A. Valenti

Ralph J. Palmisano(Designation Retained)

James L. McCrystal, Jr.(Designation Retained)

Drew M.L. Odum(Designation Retained)

Derek M. Brondou

50 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#250

#415

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#415) Memorandum Opinion and Order granting defendant Green Tweed & Company's motions 350 and 380 to strike and exclude discovery deposition testimony of plaintiff Donald French and for summary judgment (other related doc 393 ). All claims against defendant Green Tweed only are hereby dismissed. Judge Donald C. Nugent 10/18/2017(C,KA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#250) Memorandum Opinion and Order denying plaintiffs' Motion to remand case (Related Doc # 167 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent 11/10/16(C,KA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSUL COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wheeler Protective Apparel Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where FAIRMONT SUPPLY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Refractories Company is a litigant