This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 19:55:28 (UTC).

Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC v. Fort Investments LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Fort Investments LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC

Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC d/b/a The Rustic

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Valbon Beqiri

Fort Investments LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Megan M O'Laughlin

Attorney at Hitchcock Evert LLP

750 N. St. Paul St., Suite 1110

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Melinda S. Giftos

Attorney at Husch Blackwell, LLP

33 East Main Street, Suite 300, P.O. Box 1379

Madison, WI 53701-1379

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Brief in Support of #13 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Strike Counterclaims & Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC, Counter Defendant Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC. (O'Laughlin, Megan) Modified on 4/4/2018. (lak) M (Entered: 04/03/2018)

#13

(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COUNTERCLAIMS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Plaintiff Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC, Counter Defendant Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 4/24/2018. Brief in Reply due 5/4/2018. (O'Laughlin, Megan) Modified on 4/4/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

#12

(#12) ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Defendants Fort Investments LLC, Valbon Beqiri. (Giftos, Melinda) Modified on 3/14/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Melinda S. Giftos for Defendants Valbon Beqiri, Fort Investments LLC. (Giftos, Melinda) Modified on 3/14/2018: Added the Attorney To Be Noticed designation. (lak) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

#10

(#10) Summons Returned Executed. Fort Investments LLC served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

#9

(#9) Summons Returned Executed. Valbon Beqiri served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

#8

(#8) Disregard. See #10 . Modified on 3/2/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Reissued as to Defendants Valbon Beqiri and Fort Investments LLC. (jls) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Summons) (O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

#4

(#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Valbon Beqiri and Fort Investments LLC. (jls) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC. (O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - San Antonio Express News Article

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Dallas Morning News Article

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Texas Monthly About Us Page

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Texas Monthly Article

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Dallas Morning News Article

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Brief in Support of #13 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Strike Counterclaims & Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC, Counter Defendant Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC. (O'Laughlin, Megan) Modified on 4/4/2018. (lak) M (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COUNTERCLAIMS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Plaintiff Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC, Counter Defendant Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 4/24/2018. Brief in Reply due 5/4/2018. (O'Laughlin, Megan) Modified on 4/4/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Defendants Fort Investments LLC, Valbon Beqiri. (Giftos, Melinda) Modified on 3/14/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Melinda S. Giftos for Defendants Valbon Beqiri, Fort Investments LLC. (Giftos, Melinda) Modified on 3/14/2018: Added the Attorney To Be Noticed designation. (lak) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Returned Executed. Fort Investments LLC served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Returned Executed. Valbon Beqiri served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Disregard. See #10 . Modified on 3/2/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • (#7) **TEXT ONLY ORDER** Judge Conley recently modified his attachments to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, which you may access via this hyperlink: # Attachments to Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order. Please note that occasionally Judge Conley makes changes to these attachments. As such, unless you do not have access to the attachments electronically (e.g., you are a pro se litigant), you should review the most recent version of the appropriate attachment to assure compliance when preparing summary judgment or other pre-trial submissions. (lak) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Reissued as to Defendants Valbon Beqiri and Fort Investments LLC. (jls) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Summons) (O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Valbon Beqiri and Fort Investments LLC. (jls) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC. (O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Fort Investments and Valbon Beqiri ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2191917.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 5098096, issued 12/13/2016, held by Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC d/b/a The Rustic; Trademark # 5193673, issued 05/02/2017, held by Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC d/b/a The Rustic. Filed by Free Range Presents Dallas, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dallas Morning News Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - Texas Monthly Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Texas Monthly About Us Page, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dallas Morning News Article, #5 Exhibit 5 - San Antonio Express News Article, #6 Exhibit 6 - US Reg No 5,098,096, #7 Exhibit 7 - US Reg. No. 5,193,673, #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter from Paul Goetz, #9 Exhibit 9 - Valbon Beqiri's LinkedIn Page, #10 Exhibit 10 - Screenshots of Defendants' Website and Facebook Page, #11 Exhibit 11 - ICANN WHOIS Information for Defendants' Website, #12 Exhibit 12 - Letter from Megan O'Laughlin, #13 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (O'Laughlin, Megan) Modified on 2/15/2018. (lak) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less