This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2022 at 22:40:45 (UTC).

FRANCHINI, DPM v. PIPES et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 FRANCHINI, DPM filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against PIPES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGE Z. SINGAL and JOHN H. RICH III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00477

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGE Z. SINGAL

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM

Defendants

SALLY PIPES

PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP

PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE

PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP doing business as PHILADELPHIA INQUIRER doing business as PHILLY.COM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JENS-PETER W. BERGEN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JENS-PETER W. BERGEN

79 Portland Road

Kennebunk, ME 04043-6603

RAYMOND W. BELAIR

Attorney at BELAIR & EVANS LLP

90 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Defendant Attorneys

ANDREA T. HOLBROOK

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

2 Monument Square, Suite 505

Portland, ME 04101

CYNTHIA L. COUNTS

Attorney at FISHER BROYLES LLP

945 East Paces Ferry Road, Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30326

ELI SEGAL

Attorney at PEPPER HAMILTON LLP

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th & Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2799

ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV

Attorney at MCCLOSKEY, MINA, CUNNIFF, & FRAWLEY LLC

12 City Center

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) MANDATE of USCA as to #26 Notice of Appeal filed by THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM (lrc) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#30

(#30) JUDGMENT of USCA re #26 Notice of Appeal, Check for Receipt of Mandate on 9/6/2019. (lrc) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#28

(#28) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE Re: #26 Notice of Appeal. Documents sent to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#27

(#27) APPEAL COVER SHEET Re: #26 Notice of Appeal (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #24 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, by THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM . ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0100-2026012.) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from our web site at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms/ MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel should also register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf and review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (BERGEN, JENS-PETER) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#25

(#25) JUDGMENT It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Caron. (lrc) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#24

(#24) ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS granting #16 Motion to Dismiss, Granting in Part #17 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

17 #2

Ex 1 to Declaration of Sally Pipes

17 #1

Ex A. Declaration of Sally Pipes

#7

#6

#5

4 #2

PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE Summons

4 #1

PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP Summons

#4

#3

#2

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MANDATE of USCA as to #26 Notice of Appeal filed by THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM (lrc) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) JUDGMENT of USCA re #26 Notice of Appeal, Check for Receipt of Mandate on 9/6/2019. (lrc) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) USCA Case Number 19-1539 for #26 Notice of Appeal, filed by THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM. (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbbreviated Appeal Record Transmitted Electronically to U.S. Court of Appeals re #26 Notice of Appeal (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE Re: #26 Notice of Appeal. Documents sent to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) APPEAL COVER SHEET Re: #26 Notice of Appeal (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPIES of Notice of Appeal Sent to Counsel Re: #26 Notice of Appeal, filed by THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM. (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #24 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, by THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM . ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0100-2026012.) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from our web site at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms/ MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel should also register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf and review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (BERGEN, JENS-PETER) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) JUDGMENT It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Caron. (lrc) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS granting #16 Motion to Dismiss, Granting in Part #17 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eli Segal filed by ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV on behalf of PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1951787.) (FRAWLEY, ALFRED) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP Responses due by 1/24/2019. (FRAWLEY, ALFRED) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP. (FRAWLEY, ALFRED) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE of Appearance by ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV on behalf of PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP (FRAWLEY, ALFRED) Modified on 1/4/2019 to reflect that this document was filed in the wrong case (lrc). (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE, PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP, SALLY PIPES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP Summons, #2 PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE Summons)(lrc) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Raymond W. Belair filed by JENS-PETER W. BERGEN on behalf of THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1938612.) (BERGEN, JENS-PETER) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 12/7/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Received from THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM: Amount Paid: $400.00 Receipt Number: 219000270. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 11/28/2018 (lrc) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE, PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP, SALLY PIPES with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM. (Service of Process Deadline 2/19/2019) Fee due by 11/21/2018.(bfa) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE is a litigant

Latest cases where PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK (NEWSPAPERS), LLC is a litigant