This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2020 at 21:59:02 (UTC).

Fractus, S.A. v. AT&T Mobility LLC

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 Fractus, S A filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00135

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Fractus, S.A.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

AT&T Mobility LLC

CellMax Technologies AB

Intervenor Defendant and Intervenor

CommScope Technologies LLC

Consolidated Defendants and Counter Claimants

T-Mobile US, Inc.

T-Mobile USA, INC

CellMax Technologies AB

Verizon Communications Inc.

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Verizon Communications Inc

Not Classified By Court

Antonio Piazza

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

David Keyzer

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Amon Zaheer

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP - San Francisco

150 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Michael K Ng

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP - San Francisco

150 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Adriana Riviere-Badell

Attorney at Kobre & Kim, LLP - Miami

201 South Biscayne Blvd, Suite 1900

Miami, FL 33131

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Thomas John Ward, Jr

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Michael Meir Rosen

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP - San Francisco

150 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Hugham Chan

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP

1919 M Street, Nw, Suite 410

Wahington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Josh A Krevitt

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP - NYC

200 Park Ave, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166-0193

Henry Leon (Lon) Outland, III

Attorney at AT&T Services Inc - Dallas

208 S. Akard Street, Whitacre Tower, Suite 3104

Dallas, TX 75202

Eric Tsai Syu

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP - Irvine

3161 Michelson Drive, 12Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612-4412

Brett Christopher Govett

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

Nathan Robert Curtis

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLC - Dallas

2100 Mckinney Ave, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75201-6912

Benjamin Hershkowitz

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP - NYC

200 Park Ave, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166-0193

Consolidated Defendant, Counter Claimant and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 North College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

53 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

657 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#657

655 #2

Text of Proposed Order

655 #1

Exhibit A

#655

#654

#653

#640

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J - '305 Patent

1 #6

Exhibit F - '493 Patent

1 #5

Exhibit E - '256 Patent

1 #4

Exhibit D - '870 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit C - '768 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit B - '918 Patent

1 #1

Exhibit A - '191 Patent

#1

2,476 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#657) Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing Response Time to the Motion for Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Dr. Kakaes by CommScope Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#656) Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF DR. APOSTOLOS K. KAKAES by CommScope Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Dennis C. Bremer, #3 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #4 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #5 Exhibit 1 - Part 3, #6 Exhibit 1 - Part 4, #7 Exhibit 1 - Part 5, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#655) Unopposed MOTION Regarding Use of Interpreter At Trial by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ng, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#654) STIPULATION Regarding Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report and Disclosure of Julie L. Davis by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless(Consolidated from case 2:18-cv-138), Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless(Consoladated from 2:19-cv-255), CommScope Technologies LLC, CommScope Technologies LLC, Fractus, S.A., T-Mobile US, Inc.(Consolidated from case 2:18-cv-137), T-Mobile US, Inc.(Consolidated from case 2:19-c-v-256), T-Mobile US, Inc.(Consolidated from case 2:19-cv-255), T-Mobile USA, INC(Consolidated from case 2:19-cv-256), T-Mobile USA, INC(Consolidated from case 2:19-cv-255), T-Mobile USA, INC(Consolidated from case 2:18-cv-137), Verizon Communications Inc, Verizon Communications Inc.. (Sauter, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#653) REPLY TO RESPONSE to #640 Claim Construction Brief, #649 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless(Consolidated from case 2:18-cv-138), CommScope Technologies LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc.(Consolidated from case 2:18-cv-137), T-Mobile USA, INC(Consolidated from case 2:19-cv-256). (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 9/11/2019 (ch, ). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#652) ORDER granting #651 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims in Fractus, S.A., v. CellMax Technologies AB, Case Number 2:19-cv-00256-JRG, including all claims asserted against T-Mobile with respect to the CellMax products, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE Case Number 2:19-cv-00256-JRG. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/10/2019. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#651) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ng, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#650) REDACTION to #649 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Ng, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY - REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #649 . Document # 648, SEALED PATENT RESPONSE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#649) CORRECTED SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Fractus, S.A. to #640 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Ng, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
678 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Amon Zaheer on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Zaheer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Michael K Ng on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Ng, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ng, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fractus, S.A.. (Ng, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fractus, S.A. (Ng, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against AT&T Mobility LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6731314.), filed by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '191 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '918 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '768 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '870 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '256 Patent, #6 Exhibit F - '493 Patent, #7 Exhibit G - '940 Patent, #8 Exhibit H - '814 Patent, #9 Exhibit I - '824 Patent, #10 Exhibit J - '305 Patent, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ng, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CommScope Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Communications Inc. is a litigant