This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2018 at 07:01:37 (UTC).

Foundation Learning LLC v. Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy

Case Summary

On 12/29/2017 Foundation Learning LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-03182

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Foundation Learning LLC

Defendant

Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric V. Hall

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Colorado Springs

90 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 1100

Colorado Springs, CO 80903-1662

Joy T. Allen Woller

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202-5855

Defendant Attorney

Lisel Maria Ferguson

Attorney at Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch, LLP-San Diego

525 B Street, Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy. (Ferguson, Lisel) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

#16

(#16) MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Stipulation and Order to Extend Defendants Time to Respond to Complaint. Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy answer due 2/21/2018, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/12/2018. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#14

(#14) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy. (Ferguson, Lisel) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Foundation Learning LLC. Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy served on 1/18/2018, answer due 2/8/2018. (Woller, Joy) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Foundation Learning LLC. Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy served on 1/17/2018, answer due 2/7/2018. (Woller, Joy) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

11 #2

Summons

11 #1

Summons

#11

(#11) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (cthom, ) (Entered: 01/16/2018)

10 #2

Summons

10 #1

Summons

#10

(#10) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jason Schrock, Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy, Robert J Williams by Plaintiff Foundation Learning LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Woller, Joy) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

9 #3

Attachment 3

9 #2

Attachment 2

9 #1

Attachment 1

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/8/18. Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (lgale, ) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c).No summons issued. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Verified against Foundation Learning LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5873533)Attorney Eric V. Hall added to party Foundation Learning LLC(pty:pla), filed by Foundation Learning LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Eric) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM regarding #17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/21/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy. (Ferguson, Lisel) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Stipulation and Order to Extend Defendants Time to Respond to Complaint. Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy answer due 2/21/2018, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/12/2018. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/6/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy. (Ferguson, Lisel) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Foundation Learning LLC. Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy served on 1/18/2018, answer due 2/8/2018. (Woller, Joy) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Foundation Learning LLC. Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy served on 1/17/2018, answer due 2/7/2018. (Woller, Joy) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (cthom, ) (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jason Schrock, Academics, Arts and Action Charter Academy, Robert J Williams by Plaintiff Foundation Learning LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Woller, Joy) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/8/18. Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (lgale, ) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • (#8) ORDER: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte with the filing of plaintiff Foundation Learning LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 2) ("the motion"). The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to follow this Court's Civil Practice Standards (Standard II.D) and the Local Rules (Local Rule 10.1(e)) in that the motion is not double spaced. One of the purposes of that rule and standard is to aid in the reading and digestion of pleadings, something which the instant motion is not whether read through young or old eyes. To the extent plaintiff wishes to re-file its motion for preliminary injunction, it must do so in compliance of all Local Rules and Civil Practice Standards. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/2/2018. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/2/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/2/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c).No summons issued. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct date on 1/3/2018 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Foundation Learning LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Hall, Eric) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Verified against Foundation Learning LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5873533)Attorney Eric V. Hall added to party Foundation Learning LLC(pty:pla), filed by Foundation Learning LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Eric) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less