This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 17:23:10 (UTC).

Fouissi v. Zaqu, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Fouissi filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Zaqu, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-24845

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Redouane Fouissi

Defendants

Mohammed I. Alqurneh

Zaqu, Inc.

Zaqu, Inc. doing business as Midway Food Market formerly known as S&M Grocery, Inc. agent of Alqurneh LLC

S&M Grocery, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ruben Martin Saenz

Andres Rivera-Ortiz

Defendant Attorney

Bretton I. Pollack

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #13 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default, #16 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default , Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Mohammed I. Alqurneh, Zaqu, Inc.. Attorney Bretton I. Pollack added to party Mohammed I. Alqurneh(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/28/2019 (Pollack, Bretton) Modified Relief on 1/16/2019 (ls). (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bretton I. Pollack on behalf of Zaqu, Inc.. Attorney Bretton I. Pollack added to party Zaqu, Inc. (pty:dft). (Pollack, Bretton) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

18 #3

Text of Proposed Order

18 #2

Exhibit 2

18 #1

Exhibit 1

#18

(#18) Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment by Redouane Fouissi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivera-Ortiz, Andres) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#17

(#17) Statement of: FLSA Claim ( Second Amended) by Redouane Fouissi (Rivera-Ortiz, Andres) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#16

(#16) Clerks Entry of Default as to Mohammed I. Alqurneh - Motions Terminated: #15 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/7/2019. (cqs) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#13

(#13) Clerks Entry of Default as to Zaqu, Inc. per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default Re: #12 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 12/14/2018. (pes) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#7

(#8) STRICKEN - Statement of: FLSA Claim by Redouane Fouissi re #7 Notice of Court Practice (Rivera-Ortiz, Andres) Modified to strike per DE #9 on 12/3/2018 (pes). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Redouane Fouissi (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Redouane Fouissi (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Redouane Fouissi. Attorney Andres Rivera-Ortiz added to party Redouane Fouissi(pty:pla). (Rivera-Ortiz, Andres) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Mohammed I. Alqurneh, Zaqu, Inc.. (jao) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#14) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Redouane Fouissi. Mohammed I. Alqurneh served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Clerks Notice to Filer re #20 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #13 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default, #16 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default MOTION for Extension of Time to file response re #1 Complaint. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #13 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default, #16 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default , Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Mohammed I. Alqurneh, Zaqu, Inc.. Attorney Bretton I. Pollack added to party Mohammed I. Alqurneh(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/28/2019 (Pollack, Bretton) Modified Relief on 1/16/2019 (ls). (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bretton I. Pollack on behalf of Zaqu, Inc.. Attorney Bretton I. Pollack added to party Zaqu, Inc. (pty:dft). (Pollack, Bretton) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment by Redouane Fouissi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivera-Ortiz, Andres) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Statement of: FLSA Claim ( Second Amended) by Redouane Fouissi (Rivera-Ortiz, Andres) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (ap00) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Clerks Entry of Default as to Mohammed I. Alqurneh - Motions Terminated: #15 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/7/2019. (cqs) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Mohammed I. Alqurneh by Redouane Fouissi. (Rivera-Ortiz, Andres) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Redouane Fouissi. Mohammed I. Alqurneh served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Clerks Entry of Default as to Zaqu, Inc. per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default Re: #12 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 12/14/2018. (pes) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Redouane Fouissi. Zaqu, Inc. served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER STRIKING #8 Plaintiff's Statement of Claim. A new statement must be filed no later than December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (ap00) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STRICKEN - Statement of: FLSA Claim by Redouane Fouissi re #7 Notice of Court Practice (Rivera-Ortiz, Andres) Modified to strike per DE #9 on 12/3/2018 (pes). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Court Practice in FLSA Cases. Statement must be filed no later than November 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Redouane Fouissi (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Redouane Fouissi (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Redouane Fouissi. Attorney Andres Rivera-Ortiz added to party Redouane Fouissi(pty:pla). (Rivera-Ortiz, Andres) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Mohammed I. Alqurneh, Zaqu, Inc.. (jao) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11171845, filed by Redouane Fouissi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less