This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2019 at 07:29:55 (UTC).

Foster v. Esper

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Foster filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Esper. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00918

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles A Foster

Little Rock, AR 72209

Defendant

Department of the Army

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy Allen Haugh

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Civil Division

555 4Th Street, North West

Washington, DC 20530

Jamie Goss Dempsey

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARK T. ESPER. (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#12

(#12) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/26/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/12/2019. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/21/18. (lp) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

11 #1

*Restricted*

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-00737. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Goss Dempsey on behalf of Department of the Army (Dempsey, Jamie) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against MARK T. ESPER (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616090314) with Jury Demand filed by CHARLES A. FOSTER. (zsth) Modified on 4/26/2018 (znmw). [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2018)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/30/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/30/2018.) (jf) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/17/2018)

#7

No Description Available

#5

MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/19/2018. (lcapm1) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/19/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Allen Haugh on behalf of MARK T. ESPER (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/08/2018)

#6

(#8) RESPONSE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHARLES A. FOSTER. (jf) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and transferring this action to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Plaintiff is allowed leave to amend his Complaint within 21 days of the case being docketed in that court. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/15/2018. (lcapm1) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHARLES A. FOSTER. (jf) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#1

(#1) ENTERED IN ERROR.....COMPLAINT against MARK T. ESPER ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616090314) with Jury Demand filed by CHARLES A. FOSTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) Modified on 4/25/2018 (zsth). [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Goss Dempsey on behalf of Department of the Army (Dempsey, Jamie) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/26/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/12/2019. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/21/18. (lp) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • *** Removed Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney from referral role. (kdr) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-00737. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Case transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas, pursuant to Court Order entered 11/15/2018. Sent to Court by extraction. (jf) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 12/10/2018. (zjd) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and transferring this action to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Plaintiff is allowed leave to amend his Complaint within 21 days of the case being docketed in that court. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/15/2018. (lcapm1) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARK T. ESPER. (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHARLES A. FOSTER. (jf) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 8/16/2018. (zjd) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss by MARK T. ESPER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 7/16/2018. (zjd) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/19/2018. (lcapm1) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by MARK T. ESPER (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/30/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/30/2018.) (jf) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Allen Haugh on behalf of MARK T. ESPER (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MARK T. ESPER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against MARK T. ESPER (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616090314) with Jury Demand filed by CHARLES A. FOSTER. (zsth) Modified on 4/26/2018 (znmw). [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF CORRECTED COMPLAINT. Original complaint was entered in error and plaintiff was instructed to refile said pleading. (zsth) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ENTERED IN ERROR.....COMPLAINT against MARK T. ESPER ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616090314) with Jury Demand filed by CHARLES A. FOSTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) Modified on 4/25/2018 (zsth). [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.