This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2018 at 07:50:18 (UTC).

Fortress Insurance Company v. Mancini, Andy et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 Fortress Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Mancini, Andy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00598

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fortress Insurance Company

Defendants

La Petite Dentistry, Inc.

Andy Mancini

Rachel C. Anderson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cory Brewer

Attorney at Leib Knott Gaynor LLC

219 N. Milwaukee St., Suite 710

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Michele Vargas

Attorney at Clyde Co LLP US

1221 Brickell Ave, Suite 1600

Miami, FL 33131

Sean M. Gaynor

Attorney at Leib Knott Gaynor, LLC

219 N. Milwaukee Street, Suite 710

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Vargas, Michele) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Michele Vargas for Plaintiff Fortress Insurance Company. (Vargas, Michele) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Fortress Insurance Company. (Vargas, Michele) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

1 #2

Summons

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Rachel C. Anderson, La Petite Dentistry, Inc., Andy Mancini. (kwf) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit B - Letter dated April 7, 2017 and Policy

#4

(#4) Motion to Admit Michele Vargas Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2291675.) by Plaintiff Fortress Insurance Company. (Vargas, Michele) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Rachel C. Anderson. Rachel C. Anderson waiver sent on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Vargas, Michele) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Cory Brewer for Plaintiff Fortress Insurance Company. (Brewer, Cory) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2291434.), filed by Fortress Insurance Company, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Brewer, Cory) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/3/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2018: #3 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit B - Letter dated April 7, 2017 and Policy) (lak) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Vargas, Michele) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Rachel C. Anderson. Rachel C. Anderson waiver sent on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Vargas, Michele) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (kwf) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Fortress Insurance Company. (Vargas, Michele) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Rachel C. Anderson, La Petite Dentistry, Inc., Andy Mancini. (kwf) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Michele Vargas Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/3/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion to Admit Michele Vargas Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2291675.) by Plaintiff Fortress Insurance Company. (Vargas, Michele) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Michele Vargas for Plaintiff Fortress Insurance Company. (Vargas, Michele) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Cory Brewer for Plaintiff Fortress Insurance Company. (Brewer, Cory) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2291434.), filed by Fortress Insurance Company, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Brewer, Cory) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/3/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2018: #3 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit B - Letter dated April 7, 2017 and Policy) (lak) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.