This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 13:29:47 (UTC).

Ford v. Ibarguen (TWP2)

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Ford filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Ibarguen TWP2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas W Phillips and Susan K Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W Phillips

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alton Ford

Chattanooga, TN 37410

Defendants

Gary Ibarguen

Gary Ibarguen doing business as iSpecialize

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Robert McCown

Attorney at Warren & Griffin, P.C. -Dalton

513 Benjamin Way, Suite 208

Dalton, GA 30721

R Scott Jackson, Jr

Attorney at R Scott Jackson, Attorney at Law

4525 Harding Road, Suite 200

Nashville, TN 37205

Defendant Attorney

Donna J Mikel

Attorney at Burnette, Dobson & Pinchak

711 Cherry Street

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 2/25/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips.Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/17/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gary Ibarguen, Gary Ibarguen(individually). (Mikel, Donna) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

8 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non Consent

#8

(#8) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non Consent) (BJL, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gary Ibarguen.(Mikel, Donna) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Time to Answer by Gary Ibarguen. (Mikel, Donna) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/2/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/2/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 8/2/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Gary Ibarguen. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

1 #1

Other Civil Coversheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Gary Ibarguen (Filing fee $ 400.00, 0649-3732094), filed by Alton Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 2/25/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips.Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/17/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gary Ibarguen, Gary Ibarguen(individually). (Mikel, Donna) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Gary Ibarguen dba iSpecialize. (BJL, ) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non Consent) (BJL, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gary Ibarguen.(Mikel, Donna) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Time to Answer by Gary Ibarguen. (Mikel, Donna) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/2/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/2/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 8/2/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Gary Ibarguen. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • District Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Gary Ibarguen (Filing fee $ 400.00, 0649-3732094), filed by Alton Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BJL, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less