This case was last updated from PACER on 01/28/2019 at 08:15:10 (UTC).

Ford v. Credit Solutions Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Ford filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Credit Solutions Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00507

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thelma Louise Ford

Thelma Ford

Defendant

Credit Solutions Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cynthia T Lawson

Attorney at Bond, Botes & Lawson, P.C.

6704 Watermour Way

Knoxville, TN 37912

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER. ORDERED that the Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) no later than February 1, 2019.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/8/2019. (SAC, ) (Main Document 11 replaced per chambers on 1/8/2019) (GRE, ). (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Thelma Ford Case Reported Settled By 12/21/2018; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Lawson, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#9

(#9) ***FILED IN ERROR***ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/3/2018. (MRE, ) Modified on 12/3/2018 (GRE, ). (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#7

(#7) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Credit Solutions Corp. (JCK) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENT Summons Requested by Thelma Louise Ford. (Lawson, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT Signed Civil Coversheet by Thelma Louise Ford. (Lawson, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Coversheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Credit Solutions Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3828155.), filed by Thelma Louise Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons)(Lawson, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER. ORDERED that the Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) no later than February 1, 2019.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/8/2019. (SAC, ) (Main Document 11 replaced per chambers on 1/8/2019) (GRE, ). (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Thelma Ford Case Reported Settled By 12/21/2018; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Lawson, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ***FILED IN ERROR***ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/3/2018. (MRE, ) Modified on 12/3/2018 (GRE, ). (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thelma Ford. Credit Solutions Corp. served on 11/30/2018. (Lawson, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/30/2018. (JCK) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Credit Solutions Corp. (JCK) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JCK) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUPPLEMENT Summons Requested by Thelma Louise Ford. (Lawson, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUPPLEMENT Signed Civil Coversheet by Thelma Louise Ford. (Lawson, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Credit Solutions Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3828155.), filed by Thelma Louise Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons)(Lawson, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.