This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2018 at 07:36:32 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC v. Reagor-Dykes Amarillo LP et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Ford Motor Credit Company LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Reagor-Dykes Amarillo LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

Defendants

Reagor-Dykes Floydada, L.P.

Reagor Dykes Amarillo, LP

Reagor-Dykes III, L.L.C.

Reagor-Dykes Imports, L.P.

Reagor-Dykes Auto Company, L.P.

Rick Dykes

Bart Reagor

Reagor-Dykes Motors, L.P.

Reagor Auto Mall I, L.L.C.

Reagor-Dykes II, L.L.C.

Reagor-Dykes Plainview, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon K Bains

Attorney at Langley LLP

1301 Solana Blvd, Bldg 1, Ste 1545

Westlake, TX 76262

Keith A Langley

Attorney at Langley LLP

1301 Solana Blvd, Bldg 1, Ste 1545

Westlake, TX 76262

Craig A Leslie

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

Joanna Dickinson

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

Defendant Attorneys

Brad W Odell

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP

3232 Mckinney Ave, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75204

David R Langston

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown

Po Box 2585, 1500 Broadway Suite 700

Lubbock, TX 79408-2585

Scott R Wiehle

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

201 Main St., Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102

John C Sims

Attorney at Sims Hubbert & Wilson

1205 Broadway, Po Box 10236

Lubbock, TX 79408--236

Marshall M Searcy

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman

201 Main St, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102-3194

Thomas Murray Kirkendall

Attorney at Law Office of Tom Kirkendall

2 Violetta Ct

The Woodlands, TX 77381-4550

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

11 #43

Exhibit(s) QQ

11 #42

Exhibit(s) PP

11 #22

Exhibit(s) V

11 #17

Exhibit(s) Q

11 #16

Exhibit(s) P

11 #15

Exhibit(s) O

11 #14

Exhibit(s) N

1 #46

Exhibit(s) SS

1 #45

Exhibit(s) RR

1 #44

Exhibit(s) QQ

1 #43

Exhibit(s) PP

1 #42

Exhibit(s) OO

1 #40

Exhibit(s) MM

1 #39

Exhibit(s) LL

1 #38

Exhibit(s) KK

1 #37

Exhibit(s) JJ

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bart Reagor, Reagor Auto Mall I, L.L.C., Reagor-Dykes II, L.L.C., Reagor-Dykes III, L.L.C.. (Searcy, Marshall) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2019. Discovery due by 1/13/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2019. Motions due by 9/16/2019. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on September 16,2019. Motions in limine must be filed and discovery must be completed by 3:00 p.m. on January 13, 2020. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/14/2018) (zzm) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint filed by Bart Reagor, Reagor Auto Mall I, L.L.C., Reagor-Dykes II, L.L.C., Reagor-Dykes III, L.L.C. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Searcy, Marshall) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rick Dykes. (Kirkendall, Thomas) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Rick Dykes. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Kirkendall, Thomas) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rick Dykes ; served on 8/24/2018; Bart Reagor ; served on 8/23/2018; Reagor Auto Mall I, L.L.C. ; served on 8/23/2018; Reagor-Dykes II, L.L.C. ; served on 8/23/2018; Reagor-Dykes III, L.L.C. ; served on 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s), #2 Affidavit(s), #3 Affidavit(s), #4 Affidavit(s)) (Bains, Brandon) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting in part #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Thus, the Court finds that said Motion should be GRANTED IN PART and the deadline for Defendants to answer is now set at 9:00 a.m. on September 14, 2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/31/2018) (zzm) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Reagor-Dykes II, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Marshall M Searcy added to party Reagor-Dykes II, L.L.C.(pty:dft) (Searcy, Marshall) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joanna Dickinson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/29/2018) (zzm) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig A. Leslie. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/29/2018) (zzm) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: The Court finds that there is no need to proceed with Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Sequestration. Accordingly, the hearing set for August 8, 2018, is now VACATED as to all parties. The Court declines Defendants' request to stay this action in its entirety for the reasons stated in Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Reagor-Dykes Amarillo, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Auto Company, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Floydada, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Imports, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Motors, L.P., and Reagor-Dykes Plainview, L.P. are SEVERED from the above-styled and -numbered civil action. To manage the Court's docket more efficiently, the newly severed action is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED without prejudice to its being reopened if the stay is lifted or the debtors are not discharged at the conclusion of the related bankruptcy proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint addressing any claims it wishes to pursue against the non-severed Defendants on or before August 17, 2018, and Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to such amended complaint on or before August 31, 2018. New Civil Case No. 5:18-CV-190-C has been opened to reflect the severed parties. The Clerk of the Court did forward a courtesy copy of this order to the Honorable Robert L. Jones, United States Bankruptcy Judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/6/2018) (zzm) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC re: #7 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer,,, (Bains, Brandon) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to #7 Order to Show Cause filed by Rick Dykes, Bart Reagor, Reagor Auto Mall I, L.L.C., Reagor-Dykes II, L.L.C., Reagor-Dykes III, L.L.C.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney John C Sims added to party Rick Dykes(pty:dft), Attorney John C Sims added to party Bart Reagor(pty:dft), Attorney John C Sims added to party Reagor Auto Mall I, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney John C Sims added to party Reagor-Dykes II, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney John C Sims added to party Reagor-Dykes III, L.L.C.(pty:dft) (Sims, John) Modified to correct document relationship on 8/6/2018 (zzm). (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants Reagor-Dykes Amarillo, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Auto Company, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Floydada, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Imports, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Motors, L.P., and Reagor-Dykes Plainview, L.P. filed a Suggestion of Bankruptcy on 08/02/2018. Pursuant to Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code, an automatic stay is now in effect as to these Defendants and the hearing scheduled for 08/08/18, is VACATED as to each of these defendants. Therefore, the parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the hearing scheduled for 08/08/18, should not also be vacated as to the named defendants not included in the Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Responses shall be filed by 10:00 a.m. on Monday, 08/06/18. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/3/2018) (bmg) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Reagor Dykes Amarillo, LP, Reagor-Dykes Auto Company, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Floydada, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Imports, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Motors, L.P., Reagor-Dykes Plainview, L.P.. (Langston, David) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***VACATED AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS PER DOCUMENT NUMBER #10 *** ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING: Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Sequestration is set for hearing at 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, August 8, 2018, in Courtroom C-216, George M. Mahon Federal Building, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/1/2018) (zzm) Modified text on 8/3/2018 (bmg). Modified text to vacate as to all defendants on 8/6/2018 (zzm). (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (zzm) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NEW CASE NOTES: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zzm) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Bains, Brandon) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9353022) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H, #10 Exhibit(s) I, #11 Exhibit(s) J, #12 Exhibit(s) K, #13 Exhibit(s) L, #14 Exhibit(s) M, #15 Exhibit(s) N, #16 Exhibit(s) O, #17 Exhibit(s) P, #18 Exhibit(s) Q, #19 Exhibit(s) R, #20 Exhibit(s) S, #21 Exhibit(s) T, #22 Exhibit(s) U, #23 Exhibit(s) V, #24 Exhibit(s) W, #25 Exhibit(s) X, #26 Exhibit(s) Y, #27 Exhibit(s) Z, #28 Exhibit(s) AA, #29 Exhibit(s) BB, #30 Exhibit(s) CC, #31 Exhibit(s) DD, #32 Exhibit(s) EE, #33 Exhibit(s) FF, #34 Exhibit(s) GG, #35 Exhibit(s) HH, #36 Exhibit(s) II, #37 Exhibit(s) JJ, #38 Exhibit(s) KK, #39 Exhibit(s) LL, #40 Exhibit(s) MM, #41 Exhibit(s) NN, #42 Exhibit(s) OO, #43 Exhibit(s) PP, #44 Exhibit(s) QQ, #45 Exhibit(s) RR, #46 Exhibit(s) SS, #47 Exhibit(s) TT, #48 Exhibit(s) UU, #49 Exhibit(s) VV, #50 Proposed Order Show Cause) (Bains, Brandon) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REAGOR DYKES MOTORS LP DOING BUSINESS AS REAGOR AUTO MALL DOING BUS is a litigant

Latest cases where Reagor-Dykes III, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant