This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2022 at 06:20:42 (UTC).

Ford Motor Company v. Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/11/2014 Ford Motor Company filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Max O. Cogburn, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Max O. Cogburn, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Company

Petitioners

Resolute Management, Inc.

AIU Insurance Company

American Home Assurance Company

Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania

Granite State Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.

Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants

Honeywell International, Inc.

Defendant

Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC

Intervenor

Coltec Industries, Inc.

Interested Party

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

E. Duncan Getchell, Jr.

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Karen Elizabeth Sieg

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Kirk Gibson Warner

Attorney at Smith Anderson

2500 Wachovia Capitol Center, Post Office Box 2611

Raleigh, NC 27602-2611

Michael H. Brady

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Petitioner Attorneys

John S. Favate

Attorney at Hardin Kundla McKeon & Poletto P.A.

673 Morris Avenue

Springfield, NJ 07081

George Dudley Humphrey, III

Attorney at Allman Spry Davis Leggett & Crumpler, PA

380 Knollwood Street, Suite 700

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee

Attorney at Hardin Kundla McKeon & Poletto, P.A.

673 Morris Avenue

Springfield, NJ 07081

Jodi Danielle Hildebran

Attorney at Allman Spry Leggett & Crumpler, PA

380 Knollwood St, Suite 700

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

Travis Waterbury Moon

Attorney at Moon Wright & Houston, PLLC

227 West Trade Street, Suite 1800

Charlotte, NC 28202

Trevor W. Swett, III

Attorney at Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered

One Thomas Circle, Nw, Ste 1100

Washington, DC 20005

Nava Hazan

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10112

H. Lee Davis, Jr.

Attorney at Davis & Hamrick, L.L.P.

Po Box 20039, 635 West 4Th Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27120-0039

Defendant Attorneys

Garland Stuart Cassada

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.

101 North Tryon Street, Suite 1900

Jonathan C. Krisko

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.

101 N. Tryon St., Ste. 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Richard Charles Worf, Jr.

Attorney at Robinson Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.

101 N. Tryon St., Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Intervenor Attorneys

E. Taylor Stukes

Attorney at Moore & Van Allen, PLLC

100 North Tryon Street, Suite 4700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Mark Andrew Nebrig

Attorney at Moore & Van Allen

100 N Tryon St, Ste 4700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Interested Party Attorneys

Teresa E. Lazzaroni

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP

303 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Alice Sacks Johnston

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

Bny Mellon Center, Suite 5240, 500 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) Consent MOTION to Set Various Pending Motions for Hearing on July 15, 2014, and to Suspend Briefing Deadlines under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) Pending Disposition of Those Motions by Ford Motor Company.Responses due by 6/27/2014 (Sieg, Karen) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#52

(#52) MEMORANDUM in Support re #51 MOTION to Intervene by Coltec Industries, Inc.. (Nebrig, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

#51

(#51) MOTION to Intervene by Coltec Industries, Inc..Responses due by 6/23/2014 (Nebrig, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

50 #1

Exhibit A

50 #50

Main Document

#47

(#47) Joint MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 14-cv-00210; 14-cv-00215; 14-cv-00216; 14-cv-00217; and 14-cv-00221 -- Appellants' Joint Motion to Consolidate Motion to Withdraw Reference and Appeals from Bankruptcy Court's Order Denying Access to the Sealed Evidence and to Establish a Briefing Schedule by Ford Motor Company.Responses due by 5/30/2014 (Sieg, Karen) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

#27

(#54) ORDER Consolidating Cases All further pleadings to be docketed to: 3:13cv464. Member Cases: 3:14cv171,3:14cv210,3:14cv212,3:14cv214,3:14cv215,3:14cv216,3:14cv217,3:14cv221 to be administratively closed; granting #27 Consent MOTION to Set Various Pending Motions for Hearing on July 15, 2014, and to Suspend Briefing Deadlines under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) Pending Disposition of Those Motions. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/10/2014. (eef) (Entered: 06/11/2014)

#25

(#48) RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION re #2 Memorandum, #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference -- Ford Motor Company's Motion to Consolidate Motion to Withdraw Reference with Appeal from April 11, 2014 Order of the Bankruptcy Court [Opposition of the Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Consolidation] by Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants. Replies due by 5/22/2014 (Swett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi Danielle Hildebran on behalf of Resolute Management, Inc., AIU Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, Granite State Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (Hildebran, Jodi) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

2 #4

Exhibit

2 #3

Exhibit

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

2 #2

Main Document

1 #1

Proposed Order

1 #1

Main Document

#14

(#54) ORDER Consolidating Cases All further pleadings to be docketed to: 3:13cv464. Member Cases: 3:14cv171,3:14cv210,3:14cv212,3:14cv214,3:14cv215,3:14cv216,3:14cv217,3:14cv221 to be administratively closed; granting #27 Consent MOTION to Set Various Pending Motions for Hearing on July 15, 2014, and to Suspend Briefing Deadlines under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) Pending Disposition of Those Motions. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/10/2014. (eef) (Entered: 06/11/2014)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • Docket(#55) Document entered in error. (Entered: 05/13/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • DocketCases associated: Create association to 3:13-cv-00464-MOC. (eef) (Entered: 06/12/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER Consolidating Cases All further pleadings to be docketed to: 3:13cv464. Member Cases: 3:14cv171,3:14cv210,3:14cv212,3:14cv214,3:14cv215,3:14cv216,3:14cv217,3:14cv221 to be administratively closed; granting #27 Consent MOTION to Set Various Pending Motions for Hearing on July 15, 2014, and to Suspend Briefing Deadlines under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) Pending Disposition of Those Motions. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/10/2014. (eef) (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Consent MOTION to Set Various Pending Motions for Hearing on July 15, 2014, and to Suspend Briefing Deadlines under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) Pending Disposition of Those Motions by Ford Motor Company.Responses due by 6/27/2014 (Sieg, Karen) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MEMORANDUM in Support re #51 MOTION to Intervene by Coltec Industries, Inc.. (Nebrig, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION to Intervene by Coltec Industries, Inc..Responses due by 6/23/2014 (Nebrig, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 Joint MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 14-cv-00210; 14-cv-00215; 14-cv-00216; 14-cv-00217; and 14-cv-00221 -- Appellants' Joint Motion to Consolidate Motion to Withdraw Reference and Appeals from Bankruptcy Court's Order Denying Acces by Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants. Replies due by 6/9/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/29/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION re #2 Memorandum, #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference -- Ford Motor Company's Motion to Consolidate Motion to Withdraw Reference with Appeal from April 11, 2014 Order of the Bankruptcy Court by Ford Motor Company. (Sieg, Karen) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION re #2 Memorandum, #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference -- Ford Motor Company's Motion to Consolidate Motion to Withdraw Reference with Appeal from April 11, 2014 Order of the Bankruptcy Court [Opposition of the Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Consolidation] by Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants. Replies due by 5/22/2014 (Swett, Trevor) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Joint MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 14-cv-00210; 14-cv-00215; 14-cv-00216; 14-cv-00217; and 14-cv-00221 -- Appellants' Joint Motion to Consolidate Motion to Withdraw Reference and Appeals from Bankruptcy Court's Order Denying Access to the Sealed Evidence and to Establish a Briefing Schedule by Ford Motor Company.Responses due by 5/30/2014 (Sieg, Karen) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Home Assurance Company (Hildebran, Jodi) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Warner, Kirk) (Entered: 04/15/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk Gibson Warner on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Warner, Kirk) (Entered: 04/15/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Stephen Favate Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2281432. by AIU Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, Granite State Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa., Resolute Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hildebran, Jodi) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2281324. by AIU Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, Granite State Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa., Resolute Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hildebran, Jodi) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi Danielle Hildebran on behalf of Resolute Management, Inc., AIU Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, Granite State Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (Hildebran, Jodi) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketNotice to Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 4/21/2014. (jde) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jde) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM/BRIEF by Ford Motor Company re: #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (asw) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 4/28/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (asw) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Birmingham Fire Ins Co Of Pa is a litigant

Latest cases where RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AIU INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant