This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:39:43 (UTC).

Ford Motor Company v. Carpenter Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2013 Ford Motor Company filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Carpenter Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary (MDL2196). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:13-PF-10012

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary (MDL2196)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Company

Defendants

FFP Holdings, LLC

Carpenter Company

E.R. Carpenter, L.P.

Carpenter Holdings, Inc.

Flexible Foam Products LLC

Flexible Foam Products, Inc.

Ohio Decorative Products Inc.

Foamex Innovations Inc

Future Foam Inc

Hickory Springs Manufacturing Co.

Crest Foam Industries, Inc.

Mohawk Industries Inc.

Plastomer Corp.

Scottdel Inc

Vitafoam Products Canada, Ltd.

Vitafoam Inc

British Vita Unlimited

Louis Carson

David Carson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin F. Holt

Attorney at Hogan & Hartson - Washington

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

J. Robert Robertson

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US - Washington

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Meghan C. Edwards-Ford

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US - Washington

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

William L. Monts, III

Attorney at Hogan & Hartson - Washington

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Eric J. Pelton

Attorney at Kienbaum, Opperwall,

280 N. Old Woodward Avenue, Suite 400

Birmingham, MI 48009-6255

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley R. Love

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Caitlin S. Schroeder

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Christopher J. Bayh

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Deborah Pollack-Milgate

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kathleen M. Anderson

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

888 South Harrison Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Kendall Millard

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Larry A. Mackey

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Michael D. Mustard

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

888 South Harrison Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Rachel K. Steinhofer

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

600 One Summit Square

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Bethany G. Lukitsch

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Gloria B. Solomon

Attorney at Trout Cacheris & Janis

1350 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Jesse I. Winograd

Attorney at Trout Cacheris & Janis

1350 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Robert P. Trout

Attorney at Trout Cacheris & Janis

1350 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Brian Kint

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Cozen O'Connor

1900 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

F. Brenden Coller

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor - Philadelphia

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

27 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#89

(#89) Order The Plaintiff in this case has resolved all claims against all Defendants. Therefore, this case is now closed. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 9/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

#88

(#88) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Future Foam Inc. Related document #87 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/13/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

87 #1

Order of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of the Ford Motor Companys Claims Against F

87 #87

Main Document

#86

(#86) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Vitafoam, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, and British Vita Unlimited. Related document #85 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/14/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

85 #1

Exhibit Order of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of the Ford Motor Company Plaintiff&

85 #85

Main Document

#84

(#84) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co. Related document #83 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/10/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

83 #1

Proposed Order Dismissing with Prejudice Ford's Claims Against Hickory Spr

8 #8

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio for MDL 2196. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 12/03/2013)

#6

(#6) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-18) to Northern District of Ohio for MDL # 2196. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 12/03/2013)

#5

(#5) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-18) for MDL # 2196. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 12/03/2013)

4 #1

Exhibit 1 - Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ford Motor Company (Pelton, Eric) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 11/05/2013)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TMcg) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 11/04/2013)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief (1) Violation of The Sherman Act Pursuant To 15 U.S.C. Section 1; (2) Violation of Michigan Antitrust Reform Act Pursuant to Mich. Comp. Laws Section 445.772, (3) Unjust Enrichment filed by Ford Motor Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4363245 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, 10-md-2196, Judge Jack Zouhary] (Pelton, Eric) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 11/01/2013)

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) Order The Plaintiff in this case has resolved all claims against all Defendants. Therefore, this case is now closed. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 9/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Future Foam Inc. Related document #87 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/13/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Proposed Stipulation for Dismissal, with Prejudice filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of the Ford Motor Companys Claims Against Future Foam Inc.)(Holt, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Vitafoam, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, and British Vita Unlimited. Related document #85 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/14/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Proposed Stipulation for Dismissal, with Prejudice, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of the Ford Motor Company Plaintiff's Claims Against the Vitafoam Defendants)(Holt, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Hickory Springs Manufacturing, Co. Related document #83 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/10/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing with Prejudice Ford's Claims Against Hickory Springs)(Holt, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Mohawk Industries, Inc. Related document #81 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing with Prejudice Ford's Claims Against Mohawk)(Holt, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against FFP Holdings, LLC. Related document #79 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/8/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance of Counsel by William L. Monts, III filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (S,R) (Entered: 12/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance of Counsel by J. Robert Robertson filed on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (S,R) (Entered: 12/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Michigan Eastern. Case number 2:13-cv-14570. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/04/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio for MDL 2196. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 12/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-18) to Northern District of Ohio for MDL # 2196. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 12/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-18) for MDL # 2196. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 12/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Filing in the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation of Plaintiff Ford Motor Company's Notice of Potential tag-Along Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action) (Pelton, Eric) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 11/25/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ford Motor Company (Pelton, Eric) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 11/05/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TMcg) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 11/04/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief (1) Violation of The Sherman Act Pursuant To 15 U.S.C. Section 1; (2) Violation of Michigan Antitrust Reform Act Pursuant to Mich. Comp. Laws Section 445.772, (3) Unjust Enrichment filed by Ford Motor Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4363245 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, 10-md-2196, Judge Jack Zouhary] (Pelton, Eric) [Transferred from mied on 12/4/2013.] (Entered: 11/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenter Holdings, Inc. is a litigant