This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2022 at 06:31:50 (UTC).

Ford Motor Company et al v. Garlock Sealng Technologies LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2014 Ford Motor Company filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Garlock Sealng Technologies LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Graham Mullen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00401

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Graham Mullen

 

Party Details

Appellants and Interested Parties

Ford Motor Company

Honeywell International Inc.

Volkswagon Group of America, Inc.

Mt. Mckinley Insurance Company

Everest Reinsurance Company

Resolute Management, Inc.

AIU Insurance Company

American Home Assurance Company

Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania

Granite State Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa

Appellees

Garlock Sealng Technologies LLC

Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Interested Party Attorneys

Karen Elizabeth Sieg

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Kirk Gibson Warner

Attorney at Smith Anderson

2500 Wachovia Capitol Center, Post Office Box 2611

Raleigh, NC 27602-2611

H. Lee Davis, Jr.

Attorney at Davis & Hamrick, L.L.P.

Po Box 20039, 635 West 4Th Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27120-0039

Nava Hazan

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10112

Alice Sacks Johnston

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

Bny Mellon Center, Suite 5240, 500 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502

Teresa E. Lazzaroni

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP

303 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Fred L. Alvarez

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP

One North Franklin St., Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

J. Samuel Gorham, III

Attorney at J. Samuel Gorham, III, Attorney

Post Office Box 3567

Hickory, NC 28603

Tony L. Draper

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP

1001 Mckinney St., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002

Charles Brittain Walther

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 3100

Houston, TX 77002-2711

John S. Favate

Attorney at Hardin Kundla McKeon & Poletto P.A.

673 Morris Avenue

Springfield, NJ 07081

Jodi Danielle Hildebran

Attorney at Allman Spry Leggett & Crumpler, PA

380 Knollwood St, Suite 700

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

Appellee Attorneys

Albert Franklin Durham

Attorney at Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.

227 W. Trade St., Suite 1200

Charlotte, NC 28202

Ashley Kerns Neal

Attorney at Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.

227 West Trade Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Garland Stuart Cassada

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.

101 North Tryon Street, Suite 1900

John R. Miller, Jr.

Attorney at Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.

227 West Trade Street, Suite 1200

Charlotte, NC 28202

Jonathan C. Krisko

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.

101 N. Tryon St., Ste. 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Louis Adams Bledsoe, III

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.

101 North Tryon St., Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Richard Charles Worf, Jr.

Attorney at Robinson Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.

101 N. Tryon St., Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Ross Robert Fulton

Attorney at Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.

227 W. Trade St., Suite 1200

Charlotte, NC 28202

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/3/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and the instant appeal is DISMISSED, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/3/2014. (eef) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION to Dismiss -- Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/12/2014 (Sieg, Karen) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for limited Remand to Bankruptcy Court, all furtherproceedings in this matter shall be held in abeyance until further order of this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/12/2014. (jlk) (Entered: 11/12/2014)

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court -- Consent Motion for Limited Remand for Entry of Consent Order Granting Access to Rule 2019 Filings by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 11/17/2014 (Sieg, Karen) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Briefing Schedule. Committee's Response Brief due by 11/6/2014. Joint Appellants' Reply Brief due by 11/24/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/30/2014. (tmg) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Exhibit

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time of Briefing Schedule. Appellant Opening Brief due by 10/6/2014. Committee's Response Brief due 10/30/2014. Joint Appellant's Reply Brief due 11/17/2014. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/29/2014. (tmg) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

6 #1

Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles Brittain Walther for Everest Reinsurance Company,Charles Brittain Walther for Mt. Mckinley Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 09/22/2014. (jlk) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles B. Walther Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2428214. by Mt. McKinley Insurance Company, Everest Reinsurance Company. (Gorham, J.) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

3 #1

Appellant Joint Designation

3 #3

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/3/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and the instant appeal is DISMISSED, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/3/2014. (eef) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION to Dismiss -- Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/12/2014 (Sieg, Karen) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for limited Remand to Bankruptcy Court, all furtherproceedings in this matter shall be held in abeyance until further order of this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/12/2014. (jlk) (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court -- Consent Motion for Limited Remand for Entry of Consent Order Granting Access to Rule 2019 Filings by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 11/17/2014 (Sieg, Karen) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Briefing Schedule. Committee's Response Brief due by 11/6/2014. Joint Appellants' Reply Brief due by 11/24/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/30/2014. (tmg) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • DocketCase reassigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (jde) (Entered: 10/27/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines / Consent Order to Extend Briefing Deadlines by Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants. Responses due by 11/10/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swett, Trevor) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appellant's BRIEF by AIU Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, Everest Reinsurance Company, Ford Motor Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Honeywell International Inc., Lexington Insurance Company, Mt. Mckinley Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa, Resolute Management, Inc., Volkswagon Group of America, Inc.. Appellee Brief due by 10/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sieg, Karen) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time of Briefing Schedule. Appellant Opening Brief due by 10/6/2014. Committee's Response Brief due 10/30/2014. Joint Appellant's Reply Brief due 11/17/2014. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/29/2014. (tmg) (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines / Consent Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule by Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants.Responses due by 10/14/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swett, Trevor) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles Brittain Walther for Everest Reinsurance Company,Charles Brittain Walther for Mt. Mckinley Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 09/22/2014. (jlk) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles B. Walther Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2428214. by Mt. McKinley Insurance Company, Everest Reinsurance Company. (Gorham, J.) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketTEXT ONLY Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. Briefs are requested to be filed within 14 days from the date of this notice by the Appellant. The Appellee will then have 14 days within which to respond to Appellants brief. This is pursuant to Rule 8009(a) as of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Any extensions of time will be granted only upon a showing of good cause. Appellant Brief due by 9/29/2014. (tmg) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Bankruptcy Appeal Record Certificate of Readiness -designations of parties submitted herewith - documents to be accessed through BK ECF system (Attachments: #1 Appellant Joint Designation)(bkCH) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court case number 10-31607, filed by Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, Lexington Insurance Company, AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa, Volkswagon Group of America, Inc., Everest Reinsurance Company, Ford Motor Company, Honeywell International Inc., Resolute Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Mt. Mckinley Insurance Company.(Attachments: #1 RE: Appeal Order)(bkCH) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court case number 10-31607 filed by Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, Lexington Insurance Company, AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa, Volkswagon Group of America, Inc., Everest Reinsurance Company, Ford Motor Company, Honeywell International Inc., Resolute Management, Inc., American Home Assurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Mt. Mckinley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Order re: Appeal) (bkCH) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MT MCKINLEY INS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AIU INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant