This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2019 at 07:52:18 (UTC).

Foo, M.D. v. Azar II

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 Foo, M D filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Azar II. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD L. PUGLISI and JILL A. OTAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00490

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

RICHARD L. PUGLISI

Presiding Judge

JILL A. OTAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendell Foo, M.D.

Defendant

Alex M. Azar, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jared A. Washkowitz

Attorney at JAW Legal

1050 Bishop Street # 450

Honolulu, HI 96813

Jennifer A. Hansen

Attorney at Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, P.C.

101 West Broadway, Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

AO 398 form

7 #2

AO 399 form

#8

#9

#11

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service Alex M. Azar II, Hon. Matthew G. Whitaker, Hon. Jessie K. Liu, Kenji M. Price, filed by Wendell Foo, M.D.. (Hansen, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • (#10) EO: Based on Plaintiff's counsel's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 02/08/2019 is CONTINUED to 3/20/2019 at 09:00AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 3/13/2019. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendell Foo, M.D.. Alex M. Azar, II. (Washkowitz, Jared) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATION OF JENNIFER A. HANSEN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re: #2 . Signed by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 12/14/2018. (afc) JENNIFER A. HANSEN, ESQ. (Law firm: Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, P.C.) added as attorney pro hac vice for plaintiff WENDELL FOO, M.D. (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (afc) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/8/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/14/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00490-JAO-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Pro Hac Vice Admissionof Jennifer A. Hansen, Esq. of Hooper, Lundy, & Bookman PC, 101 W. Broadway, Suite 1200, San Diego, CA 92101 Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2130304.Jared A. Washkowitz appearing for Plaintiff Wendell Foo, M.D. (Washkowitz, Jared) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2130301.), filed by Wendell Foo, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Washkowitz, Jared) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared A. Washkowitz