This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:44:41 (UTC).

FONTANA v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 FONTANA filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young, Doris L. Pryor and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02630

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judges

Doris L. Pryor

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RALPH FONTANA

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Basil E. Adham

Attorney at JOHNSON LAW GROUP

2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/4/2018. (MAT) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, filed by RALPH FONTANA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5033663) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adham, Basil) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#8

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02539-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02569-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02601-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02602-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02610-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02611-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#9

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02539-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02569-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02601-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02602-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02610-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02611-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Basil E. Adham on behalf of Plaintiff RALPH FONTANA. (Adham, Basil) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:18-cv-2630-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (HET) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02539-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02569-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02601-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02602-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02610-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02611-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02539-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02569-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02601-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02602-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02610-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02611-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#6) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02628-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 9/4/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02628-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB (MAT) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/4/2018. (MAT) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:18-cv-2630-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (HET) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Basil E. Adham on behalf of Plaintiff RALPH FONTANA. (Adham, Basil) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, filed by RALPH FONTANA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5033663) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adham, Basil) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.