This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:27:12 (UTC).

Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC v. McCarthy et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against McCarthy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dave Lee Brannon and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:18-CV-81207

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dave Lee Brannon

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Appellant

Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC

Appellees

Timothy J. McCarthy

Mark J. McCarthy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Leslie Scott Osborne

Attorney at Les S. Osborne

1300 N. Federal Highway, Suite 203

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Appellee Attorney

Thomas Louis Abrams

Attorney at Gamberg & Abrams

1776 N. Pine Island Road, Suite 215

Plantation, FL 33322

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER REQUIRING BRIEFING. (Appellant's Motion for Leave to Appeal an Interlocutory Order due by 11/18/2018). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/8/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to file brief re 10 Notice 8018 and Notice to Attorney,, by Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Osborne, Leslie) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/14/2018 before Judge Mindy A. Mora, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-26 pages, Court Reporter: Jacquelyn Ann Jones, Ouellette & Mauldin Court Reporters, Inc.. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2018. (mon) . Modified text/typo on 10/5/2018 (mr1). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

5 #5

Docket Sheet

5 #4

Appellee Designated Items

5 #3

Appellee Designation

5 #2

Appellant Designated Items

5 #1

Appellant Designation

#5

(#5) Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation, #2 Appellant Designated Items, #3 Appellee Designation, #4 Appellee Designated Items, #5 Docket Sheet)(mon) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

2 #1

Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-12681-MAM, filed by Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC.(mon) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REQUIRING BRIEFING. (Appellant's Motion for Leave to Appeal an Interlocutory Order due by 11/18/2018). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/8/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Appellant Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. Appellant shall file its Brief by December 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/7/2018. (kal) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to file brief re 10 Notice 8018 and Notice to Attorney,, by Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Osborne, Leslie) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • (#10) Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 11/5/2018. (bb) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 08/24/2018 before Judge Mindy A. Mora, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-16 pages, Court Reporter: Jacquelyn Ann Jones, Ouellette & Mauldin Court Reporters, Inc.. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2018. (mon) Modified text/typo on 10/5/2018 (mr1). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 08/21/2018 before Judge Mindy A. Mora, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-36 pages, Court Reporter: Helayne Wills, Ouellette & Mauldin Court Reporters, Inc.. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2018. (mon) Modified text/typo on 10/5/2018 (mr1). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 07/24/2018 before Judge Mindy A. Mora, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-16 pages, Court Reporter: Anna M. Meagher, Ouellette & Mauldin Court Reporters, Inc.. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2018. (mon) Modified text/typo on 10/5/2018 (mr1). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/14/2018 before Judge Mindy A. Mora, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-26 pages, Court Reporter: Jacquelyn Ann Jones, Ouellette & Mauldin Court Reporters, Inc.. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2018. (mon) . Modified text/typo on 10/5/2018 (mr1). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation, #2 Appellant Designated Items, #3 Appellee Designation, #4 Appellee Designated Items, #5 Docket Sheet)(mon) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • (#4) Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • (#3) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-12681-MAM, filed by Flying Cow Ranch HC, LLC.(mon) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.