This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2018 at 07:42:37 (UTC).

Flowers v. The Troxel Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2018 Flowers filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against The Troxel Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Diane K. Vescovo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02639

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica Flowers

Defendants

Fastenal Company

The Troxel Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Thomas Hackett

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN-MEMPHIS LLC

40 S. Main Street, Ste. 2600

Memphis, TN 38103

Steven Nauman

20 N Orange Ave, Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas P. Cassidy, Jr.

Attorney at McANGUS GOUDELOCK & COURIE

1661 International Place, Ste 400

Memphis, TN 38120

Garrett Hunter O'Brien

Attorney at MCANGUS, GOUDELOCK, COURIE, LLC

5350 Poplar Ave., Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38119

Patrick G. Walker

Attorney at FARRIS BOBANGO BRANAN, PLC - Memphis

999 S. Shady Grove Road, Suite 500

Memphis, TN 38120

Garrett M. Estep

Attorney at FARRIS BOBANGO BRANAN, PLC - Memphis

999 S. Shady Grove Road, Suite 500

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) NOTICE by The Troxel Company interrogatories and document requests have been served upon the plaintiff (Estep, Garrett) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#28

(#28) ORDER CLARIFYING CASE STATUS. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/13/2018. (shl) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

27 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - 110718

27 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Email 110518

27 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Email 102318

27 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Email 092618

#27

(#27) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Fastenal Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email 092618, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Email 102318, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Email 110518, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 110718)(Cassidy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#26

(#26) NOTICE by Veronica Flowers (Nauman, Steven) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#25

(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fastenal Company.(Cassidy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Flowers as to The Troxel Company. (Hackett, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Flowers as to Fastenal Company. (Hackett, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Fastenal Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to The Troxel Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #3

Summons Summons Fastenal Company

1 #2

Summons Summons Troxel Company

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Answer to the Complaint by The Troxel Company.(Estep, Garrett) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE by The Troxel Company interrogatories and document requests have been served upon the plaintiff (Estep, Garrett) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER CLARIFYING CASE STATUS. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/13/2018. (shl) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Fastenal Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email 092618, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Email 102318, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Email 110518, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 110718)(Cassidy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE by Veronica Flowers (Nauman, Steven) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fastenal Company.(Cassidy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Cassidy, Jr on behalf of Fastenal Company (Cassidy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett Hunter O'Brien on behalf of Fastenal Company (O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Response due by 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/7/2018. (shl) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Troxel Company. (Estep, Garrett) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Answer to the Complaint by The Troxel Company.(Estep, Garrett) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Flowers as to The Troxel Company. (Hackett, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Flowers as to Fastenal Company. (Hackett, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Fastenal Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to The Troxel Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Veronica Flowers has been filed. For future reference, please note: Civil cover sheet contains wet signature. All documents submitted by counsel must contain electronic signature of the filer. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2881601), filed by Veronica Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Troxel Company, #3 Summons Summons Fastenal Company)(Hackett, William) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less