This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2018 at 07:07:29 (UTC).

FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY v. DETZNER

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against DETZNER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES A STAMPELOS and ROBERT L HINKLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00463

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES A STAMPELOS

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L HINKLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY

Defendant

KENNETH W DETZNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC E ELIAS

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP - WASHINGTON DC

700 13Th St Nw, Ste 700

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

500 S Bronough Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

ASHLEY E DAVIS

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

Ra Gray Building, 500 South Bronough Street, Suite 100

Tallahassee, FL 32399

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS - The plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. 14 in Case No. 4:18cv466, to extend the deadline to respond to the motion to dismiss, ECF No. 13 in that case, is granted. The plaintiffs may file by 12/5/2018, a memorandum in response to the motion to dismiss. Any new memorandum must completely replace the memorandum filed on November 19 (ECF No. 15 in Case No. 4:18cv466). Any new memorandum must be filed in Consolidated Case No. 4:18cv463, as required by the Order Consolidating Cases. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/29/2018. (cle) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES - These cases (4:18-cv-466 and 4:18-cv-463) are consolidated for case-management purposes and will be maintained on a common docket under Consolidated Case No. 4:18cv463. Every filing - other than a complaint (or counterclaim or third-party complaint), answer, judgment, notice of appeal, or motion to amend or amended version of any of them - that is applicable to either case must be filed in the common docket and must not be filed separately in the other case. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/16/2018. (cle) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (MCVAY, BRADLEY) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER conditionally denying #3 Motion for TRO. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/10/18. (RH) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

9 #9

Exhibit I

9 #8

Exhibit H

9 #7

Exhibit G

9 #6

Exhibit F

9 #5

Exhibit E

9 #4

Exhibit D

9 #3

Exhibit C

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (DAVIS, ASHLEY) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER SETTING PROCEDURES ON THE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/10/18. (sms) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

3 #1

Exhibit Memorandum in Support

#3

(#3) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause by FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support) (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS - The plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. 14 in Case No. 4:18cv466, to extend the deadline to respond to the motion to dismiss, ECF No. 13 in that case, is granted. The plaintiffs may file by 12/5/2018, a memorandum in response to the motion to dismiss. Any new memorandum must completely replace the memorandum filed on November 19 (ECF No. 15 in Case No. 4:18cv466). Any new memorandum must be filed in Consolidated Case No. 4:18cv463, as required by the Order Consolidating Cases. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/29/2018. (cle) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES - These cases (4:18-cv-466 and 4:18-cv-463) are consolidated for case-management purposes and will be maintained on a common docket under Consolidated Case No. 4:18cv463. Every filing - other than a complaint (or counterclaim or third-party complaint), answer, judgment, notice of appeal, or motion to amend or amended version of any of them - that is applicable to either case must be filed in the common docket and must not be filed separately in the other case. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/16/2018. (cle) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (MCVAY, BRADLEY) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER conditionally denying #3 Motion for TRO. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/10/18. (RH) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (DAVIS, ASHLEY) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE by FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY re #6 Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER SETTING PROCEDURES ON THE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/10/18. (sms) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • (#5) ORDER SETTING PROCEDURES ON THE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/10/18 (SMS). Modified on 10/10/2018 (sms). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to KENNETH W DETZNER. (cle) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause by FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support) (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Emergency Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against KENNETH W DETZNER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4306549.), filed by FLORIDA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons) (ELIAS, MARC) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less