This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:11:17 (UTC).

Josephine Flores v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Josephine Flores filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Nancy A Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07446

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josephine Flores

Defendants

Commissioner Social Security

Nancy A. Berryhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven G Rosales

Attorney at Law Offices of Lawrence D Rohlfing

12631 East Imperial Highway Suite C115

Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670

Defendant Attorneys

Michael K Marriott

Attorney at SAUSA - Office of the United States Attorney

160 Spear Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105-1545

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

Assistant US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER RE REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (vm) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#11

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT Updated 4/21/17) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) (vm) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#9

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • (#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV18-7446 MRW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Josephine Flores, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/17/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 60 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (vm) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT Updated 4/21/17) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) (vm) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RE REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (vm) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Josephine Flores, (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Josephine Flores. (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Josephine Flores. (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Josephine Flores. (Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Josephine Flores. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Josephine Flores (pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.